Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1687147

EP1687147 - Valve device, ink cartridge comprising the valve device and method of supplying ink [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/32]INK CARTRIDGE
[2007/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.12.2008
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.12.2010  [2010/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
[2006/32]
Inventor(s)01 / SASAKI, T., c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. I.P. Dept.
1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP
02 / HATTORI, S., c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. I.P. Dept.
1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP
03 / KANBE, T., c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. I.P. Dept.
1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP
04 / TAKAGI, A., c/o Brother Kogyo K.K. I.P. Dept.
1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP
 [2006/32]
Representative(s)Hofer, Dorothea , et al
Prüfer & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/32]Hofer, Dorothea , et al
Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date04799894.325.11.2004
[2006/32]
WO2004JP17896
Priority number, dateJP2003039432325.11.2003         Original published format: JP 2003394323
JP2003039432425.11.2003         Original published format: JP 2003394324
JP2003040964008.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003409640
JP2003040907708.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003409077
JP2004003171209.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004031712
JP2004003287210.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004032872
JP2004004397820.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004043978
JP2004004776824.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004047768
JP2004005316427.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004053164
JP2004006045604.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004060456
[2006/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005051666
Date:09.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1687147
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005
[2006/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1687147
Date:20.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.06.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2006/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Ventil, Tintenpatrone mit diesem Ventil und Tintenversorgungsverfahren[2007/36]
English:Valve device, ink cartridge comprising the valve device and method of supplying ink[2007/36]
French:Soupape, cartouche à encre comprenant la soupape et méthode d'alimentation en encre[2007/36]
Former [2006/32]TINTENPATRONE
Former [2006/32]INK CARTRIDGE
Former [2006/32]CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE
Entry into regional phase10.06.2005National basic fee paid 
10.06.2005Search fee paid 
22.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2005Examination requested  [2006/32]
06.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2007Fee for grant paid
19.12.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.11.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
IT20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
TR20.02.2008
BG20.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
GR21.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
HU21.08.2008
[2010/51]
Former [2010/38]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
IT20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
TR20.02.2008
BG20.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
HU21.08.2008
Former [2010/36]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
IT20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
BG20.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
HU21.08.2008
Former [2009/41]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
IT20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
BG20.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/35]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CY20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
BG20.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/24]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
BG20.05.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2009/22]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
EE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/49]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
CZ20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
NL20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
RO20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SK20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
PT21.07.2008
Former [2008/46]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
DK20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
SE20.05.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
Former [2008/44]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
SI20.02.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
Former [2008/43]AT20.02.2008
BE20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
PL20.02.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
Former [2008/39]AT20.02.2008
FI20.02.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
Former [2008/36]FI20.02.2008
ES31.05.2008
IS20.06.2008
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]EP1147903  (CANON FINETECH INC [JP]);
 [Y]EP1000753  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]);
 [Y]EP1043161  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP])
by applicantJPH03197052
 JPH0920018
 JPH1158775