Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1714260

EP1714260 - AUTOMOBILE COMMUNICATION AND REGISTRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2010
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.09.2010  [2010/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nattel Group, Inc.
530 East 76th Street, 34e
New York, NY 10021 / US
[2006/43]
Inventor(s)01 / NATH, Sanjeev
530 East 76th Street, 34E
New York, NY 10021 / US
02 / PATEL, Rajesh
77 Highland Street
Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US
 [2006/43]
Representative(s)Lucas, Phillip Brian
Lucas & Co.
135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/43]Lucas, Phillip Brian
Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road
Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB
Application number, filing date04800790.004.11.2004
[2006/43]
WO2004US36899
Priority number, dateUS2003070445607.11.2003         Original published format: US 704456
[2006/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005048051
Date:26.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1714260
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005
[2006/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.03.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/01
[2006/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMOBIL-KOMMUNIKATIONS- UND REGISTRIERDATENBANK-SYSTEM[2006/43]
English:AUTOMOBILE COMMUNICATION AND REGISTRY SYSTEM[2006/43]
French:SYSTEME D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE COMMUNICATION AUTOMOBILE[2006/43]
Entry into regional phase17.08.2006National basic fee paid 
17.08.2006Search fee paid 
17.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
17.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
02.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/39]
12.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.08.2006AT   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006BE   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006BG   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006CH   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006CY   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006CZ   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006DK   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006EE   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006ES   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006FI   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006GR   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006HU   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006IE   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006IS   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006LU   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006MC   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006NL   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006PL   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006PT   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006RO   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006SI   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006SK   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
17.08.2006TR   M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.08.2006M01   Fee paid on   17.08.2006
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO03058562  (BAHAR REUBEN [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 19 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 7 * * page 10, lines 2-14 * * page 15, lines 12-29 * * page 22, line 30 - page 23, line 25; figures 1,2 * [A] 11-14;
 [XA]WO9849654  (EREL D [IL]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, lines 6-9 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, lines 16-26 * * page 9, lines 8-17 * * page 9, lines 33-36 * * page 17, lines 14-22 * [A] 11-14;
 [XA]US5751973  (HASSETT JOHN J [US]) [X] 7-10 * column 2, lines 36-64 * * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 9; figure 1 * [A] 1-6,11-14
International search[Y]US5796084  (OLSSON LARS [SE]);
 [Y]US6526335  (TREYZ G VICTOR [US], et al);
 [YP]US6791473  (KIBRIA SAMI [CA], et al);
 [YP]US6646568  (MACPHAIL MARGARET GARDNER [US], et al);
 [A]CA2413198  (TELECOMM RES LAB [CA]);
 [AE]US6816085  (HAYNES MICHAEL N [US], et al);
 [A]US6513711  (HJELMVIK TORBERNT [SE])