Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1697146

EP1697146 - DATA SUPPORT WITH IDENTIFICATIONS WRITTEN THEREON BY MEANS OF A LASER BEAM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
[2018/04]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BERGMANN, Matthias
Im Mosenborn 18
67169 Kallstadt / DE
02 / ENDRES, Günter
Karneidplatz 24
81547 München / DE
03 / KRUSE, Georg
Salmdorfer Strasse 20
85609 Aschheim / DE
 [2011/34]
Former [2006/41]01 / BERGMANN, Matthias
Im Mosenborn 18
67169 / DE
02 / ENDRES, Günter
Karneidplatz 24
81547 München / DE
03 / KRUSE, Georg
Salmdorfer Strasse 20
85609 Aschheim / DE
Former [2006/36]01 / BERGMANN, Matthias
Strasskirchen 7c
83569 Vogtareuth / DE
02 / ENDRES, Günter
Karneidplatz 24
81547 München / DE
03 / KRUSE, Georg
Salmdorfer Strasse 20
85609 Aschheim / DE
Representative(s)Zeuner Summerer Stütz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft
Nußbaumstraße 8
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Zeuner Summerer Stütz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Nußbaumstraße 8
80336 München / DE
Former [2012/07](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date04803402.901.12.2004
[2006/36]
WO2004EP13634
Priority number, dateDE2003105878412.12.2003         Original published format: DE 10358784
[2006/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005058610
Date:30.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1697146
Date:06.09.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005
[2006/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1697146
Date:15.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.02.2006
ClassificationInternational:B42D15/10
[2006/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/36]
TitleGerman:DATENTRÄGER MIT MITTELS LASERSTRAHL EINGESCHRIEBENEN KENNZEICHNUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2006/36]
English:DATA SUPPORT WITH IDENTIFICATIONS WRITTEN THEREON BY MEANS OF A LASER BEAM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF[2006/36]
French:SUPPORT DE DONNEES POURVU D'IDENTIFICATIONS INSCRITES AU MOYEN D'UN FAISCEAU LASER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT SUPPORT[2006/36]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2006National basic fee paid 
09.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/39]
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2011Fee for grant paid
11.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.11.2012  20.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB, et al
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  15.11.2012  20.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Gemalto AG
Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12
5000 Aarau / CH
Opponent's representative
Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  15.11.2012  20.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB, et al
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  15.11.2012  20.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Gemalto AG
Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12
5000 Aarau / CH
Opponent's representative
Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Former [2012/52]
Opponent(s)01  15.11.2012  20.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner, et al
Potsdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
 02  15.11.2012  20.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Trüb AG
Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12
5000 Aarau / CH
Opponent's representative
Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
21.12.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition03.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1118/16
28.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
09.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.12.2004
CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
BG15.05.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
AT01.12.2012
LU01.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
BG15.05.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
AT01.12.2012
LU01.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2014/24]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
BG15.05.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
AT01.12.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2013/48]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
BG15.05.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
BE31.12.2012
CH31.12.2012
LI31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2013/44]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
BG15.05.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
BE31.12.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2013/33]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
BG15.05.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
MC31.12.2012
Former [2012/50]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
SK15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
Former [2012/49]CY15.02.2012
CZ15.02.2012
DK15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
RO15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
SI15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
Former [2012/48]CY15.02.2012
EE15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
SE15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
Former [2012/47]CY15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
IE15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY15.02.2012
FI15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI15.02.2012
LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
PL15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
PT15.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
GR16.05.2012
IS15.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT15.02.2012
NL15.02.2012
IS15.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT15.02.2012
IS15.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT15.02.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0219012  (G A O GESELLSCHAFT FUR AUTOMATION UND ORGANISATION MBH; GAO GESELLSCHA) [X] 1-15,17-19 * column 4, line 29 - column 19, line 57; figures 1-3 * [Y] 16;
 [Y]DE19749789  (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH, 10969 BERLIN, DE) [Y] 16 * column 4, lines 62-67 *