Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1748994

EP1748994 - NITROOXYDERIVATIVES OF ANTIHYPERTENSIVE DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nicox S.A.
Taissounières HB4 1681 route des Dolines, BP 313
06560 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/06]For all designated states
NicOx S.A.
Taissounières HB4 1681 route des Dolines, BP 313
06560 Sophia Antipolis - Valbonne / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DEL SOLDATO, Piero
Via E. Toti, 22
I-20052 Monza / IT
02 / BENEDINI, Francesca
Via Padova, 286
I-20132 Milano / IT
03 / ONGINI, Ennio
Via Fratelli Cervi, Residenza Campo
I-20090 Segrate / IT
 [2008/41]
Former [2007/06]01 / DEL SOLDATO, Piero
Via E. Toti, 22
I-20052 Monza / IT
02 / BENEDINI, Francesca
Via Padova, 286
I-20132 Milano / IT
03 / ONGINI, Ennio
Via Fratelli Cervi,Residenza Campo
I-20090 Segrate / IT
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2007/06]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date04803433.401.12.2004
[2007/06]
WO2004EP13682
Priority number, dateEP2003010448502.12.2003         Original published format: EP 03104485
[2007/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005054218
Date:16.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1748994
Date:07.02.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005
[2007/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1748994
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07D285/10, A61K31/433, A61P9/00
[2007/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/06]
Extension statesAL23.06.2006
BA23.06.2006
HR23.06.2006
LV23.06.2006
MK23.06.2006
YU23.06.2006
TitleGerman:NITROOXYDERIVATE VON BLUTDRUCKSENKENDEN ARZNEIMITTELN[2007/06]
English:NITROOXYDERIVATIVES OF ANTIHYPERTENSIVE DRUGS[2007/06]
French:DERIVES DE NITROOXY DES MEDICAMENTS ANTIHYPERTENSEURS[2007/06]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2006National basic fee paid 
23.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2006Examination requested  [2007/06]
05.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2008Fee for grant paid
18.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2010/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/11]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/44]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/41]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
Former [2009/35]NL18.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0061541  (NICOX SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-49 * example 4; claims 1,5 *;
 [Y]WO0112584  (NICOX SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-49 * example 2; claims 1,4 *;
 [YD]US4801596  (SIMON HERBERT [DE], et al) [YD] 1-49 * column 2, line 38 - line 44; claim 1 *;
 [YD]US5639904  (PRAT QUINONES MARIA [ES], et al) [YD] 1-49 * column 4, line 26 - line 31; claim 1 *