Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1716195

EP1716195 - MULTICOMPONENT KIT FOR FASTENING PURPOSES AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG
Klaus-Fischer-Strasse 1
72178 Waldachtal / DE
[2014/45]
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
Former [2008/13]For all designated states
fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
Former [2006/44]For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VOGEL, Martin
Landstrasse 3
79286 Glottertal / DE
02 / GRÜN, Jürgen
Im Grün 8
79268 Bötzingen / DE
03 / WASMER, Elke
Am Mühlbach 4
79312 Emmendingen / DE
04 / SCHLENK, Christian
Lerchenstrasse 6
79211 Denzlingen / DE
05 / SCHÄTZLE, Joachim
Oberer Zirkel 63
79341 Kenzingen / DE
 [2006/44]
Representative(s)Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes , et al
Maucher Jenkins
Patent-und Rechtsanwälte
Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41](deleted)
...
Former [2008/13]Suchy, Ulrich Johannes , et al
fischerwerke GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
Former [2006/44]Suchy, Ulrich Johannes
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
Application number, filing date04804155.222.12.2004
[2006/44]
WO2004EP14559
Priority number, dateDE2004100846419.02.2004         Original published format: DE102004008464
[2006/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005090433
Date:29.09.2005
Language:DE
[2005/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1716195
Date:02.11.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005
[2006/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1716195
Date:08.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:C04B26/14, C04B28/02, C08G59/62, C04B111/00
[2018/02]
Former International [2006/44]C08G59/52, C08G59/62
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/28]
Former [2006/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRKOMPONENTENKIT FÜR BEFESTIGUNGSZWECKE UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG[2006/44]
English:MULTICOMPONENT KIT FOR FASTENING PURPOSES AND THE USE THEREOF[2006/44]
French:KIT A PLUSIEURS COMPOSANTS UTILISE A DES FINS DE FIXATION ET SON UTILISATION[2006/44]
Entry into regional phase11.05.2006National basic fee paid 
11.05.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
11.05.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/44]
07.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2015Fee for grant paid
22.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.04.2016  14.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hüttermann, Aloys
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2017/39]
Former [2016/20]
Opponent(s)01  08.04.2016  14.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Hüttermann, Aloys
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner
Speditionstrasse 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Michalski, Stefan, et al
Michalski Hüttermann & Partner
Patentanwälte
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
19.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.12.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.01.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.01.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0632/18
08.05.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
08.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
18.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
25.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.12.2004
BG08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE22.12.2015
LU22.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/45]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
IE22.12.2015
LU22.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/36]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU22.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/34]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
LU22.12.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/33]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/24]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
BE31.12.2015
Former [2016/23]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/22]EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/10]FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
GR09.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT08.07.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0601668  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 41 - line 54 * * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 19 * * page 5, line 10 - line 17; claims 1,8,9 *;
 [A]EP0003479  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 30 * * page 9, line 20 - page 12, line 10; example 10; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5578685  (NEUMANN UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 42 * * column 6, line 16 - line 54; examples 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3124232  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line 20; example -; claim 1 *
OppositionEP0601668
 EP0003479
 DE19832669
 DE2025343
 DE10002605
    - Stefan Piper, "Moderne Varianten der Mannich-Reaktion zur Aminoalkylierung von Aldehyden, Nitroalkanen und cyclischen Dienen", Dissertation Von der Fakultät für Naturwissenschaften Department Chemie der Universität Paderborn zur Erlangung des Grades eines Doktors der Naturwissenschaften, (20020000), pages 1 - 175, URL: http://d-nb.info/968635334/34, XP055301296
    - "Spindeln LV, RV/HA/HB", Brookfield, (20160000), XP055301298
    - CHRISTIAN LÜDERS, "Entwicklung von Analysenverfahren und Referenzmaterialien für die Bestimmung von Phenolen in umweltrelevanten Matrices", Dissertation zur Erlangung des akademischen Grades doctor rerum naturalium ( Dr. rer. nat.) im Fach Chemie eingereicht an der Mathematisch-Naturwissenschaftlichen Fakultät I der Humboldt-Universität zu Berlin, (19990000), pages 1 - 125, XP055301300
    - "Sicherheitsdatenblatt EPIKURE Curing Agent 111", Hexion, (20150505), pages 1 - 22, XP055301302
    - "Bakelite Produktbroschüre", Hexion, (20020900), page 45, XP055301304
    - ERNEST W. FLICK, Epoxy Resins, Curing Agents, Compounds, and Modifiers: An Industrial Guide, (19930000), vol. 519, page 124, ISBN 0815513224, XP055301306
    - "Datenblatt Beckopox VEH 2626", Cytec, (20100000), pages 4 - 7, XP055301313