Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1716195


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
20.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.01.2020  [2020/04]
13.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.01.2020  [2020/03]
08.05.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
09.03.2018 Change: Appeal number
09.03.2018 New entry: Appeal number
09.03.2018 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
07.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
07.01.2018 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.12.2017 Change - classification published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.12.2017 Change - classification published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
25.08.2017 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
28.03.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
28.11.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2016 Change - representative
07.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
16.09.2016 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
18.05.2016 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
15.04.2016 Opposition filed published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
05.06.2015 (Expected) grant published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
29.05.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.05.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
22.05.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.02.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.12.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.10.2014 Change - applicant published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
05.09.2014 Change - representative published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
22.08.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.06.2014 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.02.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.10.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2009 Change - applicant published on  09.12.2009  [2009/50]
27.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.02.2008 Change - applicant published on  26.03.2008  [2008/13]
22.02.2008 Change - representative published on  26.03.2008  [2008/13]
09.08.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.04.2007 Change - extension states published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
29.03.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.12.2006 First examination report
02.12.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.09.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2006  [2006/44]
29.09.2006 Request for examination filed published on  02.11.2006  [2006/44]
04.08.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
19.05.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
18.05.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
11.03.2005 PCT data prior to European publication