Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1711513

EP1711513 - NANOFILTRATION OF FACTOR VII SOLUTIONS TO REMOVE VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novo Nordisk Health Care AG
Thurgauerstrasse 36/38
8050 Zürich / CH
[2013/15]
Former [2006/42]For all designated states
Novo Nordisk Health Care AG
Andreasstrasse 15
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTENSEN, Jesper
Snogegardsvaenget 9, I.th.
DK-2820 Gentofte / DK
02 / HALKJAER, Erik
Ole Jorgensens Gade 3, 3. tv.
DK-2200 Copenhagen N. / DK
03 / PREUSS, Turid
Hove Mollevej 4, Hove
DK-2765 Smorum / DK
04 / HANSEN, Thomas, Budde
Aegirsgade 74 k st. tv.
DK-2200 Copenhagen N. / DK
05 / TOMODA, Lene Vaedele Madsen
Bredebovej 31, st. th
DK-2800 Lyngby / DK
06 / JOHANSEN, Nina
Knud Anchers vej 74
DK-2610 Rodovre / DK
 [2013/32]
Former [2006/42]01 / CHRISTENSEN, Jesper
Snogegardsvaenget 9, I.th.
DK-2820 Gentofte / DK
02 / HALKJAER, Erik
Ole Jorgensens Gade 3, 3. tv.
DK-2200 Copenhagen N. / DK
03 / PREUSS, Turid
Hove Mollevej 4, Hove
DK-2765 Smorum / DK
04 / HANSEN, Thomas, Budde
Aegirsgade 74 k st. tv.
DK-2200 Copenhagen N. / DK
05 / TOMODA, Lene, Vaedele, Madsen
Bredebovej 31, st. th
DK-2800 Lyngby / DK
06 / JOHANSEN, Nina
Knud Anchers vej 74
DK-2610 Rodovre / DK
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Nilsson, Karin Norvin
Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé
2880 Bagsværd / DK
Former [2006/42]Nilsson, Karin Norvin
Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Patents, Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date04804635.301.12.2004
[2006/42]
WO2004EP53206
Priority number, dateDK2003000177501.12.2003         Original published format: DK 200301775
[2006/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005054275
Date:16.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1711513
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005
[2006/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1711513
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/34
[2006/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/42]
TitleGerman:NANOFILTRATION VON FAKTOR VII LÖSUNGEN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON VIREN[2013/23]
English:NANOFILTRATION OF FACTOR VII SOLUTIONS TO REMOVE VIRUS[2006/42]
French:NANOFILTRATION DE COMPOSITIONS LIQUIDES CONTENANT LE FACTEUR VII POUR ELIMINER DES VIRUS[2006/42]
Former [2006/42]NANOFILTRATION VON FAKTOR-VII-LÖSUNGEN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON VIRUS
Entry into regional phase03.07.2006National basic fee paid 
03.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/42]
06.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2011Observations by third parties
09.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2013Observations by third parties
30.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.05.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2014Fee for grant paid
22.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10181049.7  / EP2275432
EP19186952.8
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.06.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.03.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  02.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratoire Français du Fractionnement et des Biotechnologies
3, Avenue des Tropiques
ZA de Courtaboeuf
91940 Les Ulis / FR
Opponent's representative
August Debouzy
6-8, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2017/11]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  02.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratoire Français du Fractionnement et des Biotechnologies
3, Avenue des Tropiques
ZA de Courtaboeuf
91940 Les Ulis / FR
Opponent's representative
August & Debouzy avocats
6-8 avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2015/20]
Opponent(s)01  31.03.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  02.04.2015  08.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratoire Français du Fractionnement et des Biotechnologies
3, Avenue des Tropiques
ZA de Courtaboeuf
91940 Les Ulis / FR
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Becker et Associés
25, rue Louis le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
08.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
22.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition03.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0336/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
01.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0336/17
28.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.05.2012Request for further processing filed
21.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.06.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.10.2009Request for further processing filed
19.10.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.11.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
LU01.12.2014
[2016/27]
Former [2015/50]CY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
LU01.12.2014
Former [2015/35]CY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
LU01.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
Former [2015/22]CY02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
Former [2015/10]LT02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
Former [2015/08]LT02.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9837086  (SANQUIN BLOEDVOORZIENING [NL], et al) [X] 1-34,42,43 * page 3, line 34 *;
 [X]EP0131740  (NEW YORK BLOOD CENTER INC [US]) [X] 35-43 * claims 6,14 *;
 [X]EP0549964  (OCTAPHARMA AG [CH]) [X] 35-43 * page 3, line 19 - line 23 *;
 [X]  - TOMOKIYO K ET AL, "Large-scale production and properties of human plasma-derived activated Factor VII concentrate", VOX SANGUINIS, S. KARGER AG, BASEL, CH, (200301), vol. 84, no. 1, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 54 - 64, XP002286502 [X] 1-34,42,43 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1423-0410.2003.00247.x
 [X]  - BURNOUF T ET AL, "NANOFILTRATION OF PLASMA-DERIVED BIOPHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS", HAEMOPHILIA, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (200301), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1351-8216, pages 24 - 37, XP001181709 [X] 1-34,42,43 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2516.2003.00701.x
 [A]  - EIGENBROT C, "STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND ACTIVATION OF COAGULATION FACTOR VII", CURRENT PROTEIN AND PEPTIDE SCIENCE, BENTHAM SCIENCE PULBISHERS, NL, (200206), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 1389-2037, pages 287 - 299, XP001153828 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1389203023380675
 [X]  - HOROWITZ B ET AL, "Virus inactivation by solvent/detergent treatment and the manufacture of SD-plasma.", VOX SANGUINIS. 1998, (1998), vol. 74 Suppl 1, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 203 - 206, XP009048852 [X] 35-43 * page 204 *
 [A]  - CHANDRA S ET AL, "EFFECTIVENESS OF ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS FOR REDUCING POTENTIAL VIRAL CONTAMINANTS FROM PLASMA-DERIVED PRODUCTS", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (20020301), vol. 105, no. 5, ISSN 0049-3848, pages 391 - 400, XP001181710 [A] 35-43 * page 395, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 398, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-3848(02)00044-0
ExaminationWO9966031
 US5677162
    - MOLLERUP I ET AL, "THE USE OF RP-HPLC FOR MEASURING ACTIVATION AND CLEAVAGE OF RFVIIA DURING PURIFICATION", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19950101), vol. 48, no. 5, doi:DOI:10.1002/BIT.260480512, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 501 - 505, XP009058728

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260480512
    - SAMAMA C M, "Prothrombin complex concentrates: a brief review", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200810), Database accession no. PREV200800637606
    - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF ANAESTHESIOLOGY, (200810), vol. 25, no. 10, doi:10.1017/S0265021508004675, ISSN 0265-0215, pages 784 - 789
    - THIM L ET AL, "Amino acid sequence and posttranslational modifications of human factor VII-a from plasma and transfected baby hamster kidney cells", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19880101), vol. 27, no. 20, doi:10.1021/BI00420A030, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 7785 - 7793, XP002203678

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00420a030
    - RADCLIFFE R ET AL, "ACTIVATION AND CONTROL OF FACTOR-VII BY ACTIVATED FACTOR-X AND THROMBIN ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A SINGLE CHAIN FORM OF FACTOR-VII", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1975), Database accession no. PREV197559053000
    - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1975), vol. 250, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 388 - 395
    - PEDERSEN A H ET AL, "AUTOACTIVATION OF HUMAN RECOMBINANT COAGULATION FACTOR VII", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19890101), vol. 28, no. 24, doi:10.1021/BI00450A013, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 9331 - 9336, XP002408656

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00450a013
    - JOSIC D ET AL, "Manufcturing of a Prothrombin Complex Concentrate Aiming at Low Thrombogenicity", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, TARRYTOWN, NY, US, (20000101), vol. 100, ISSN 0049-3848, pages 433 - 441, XP003028450

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-3848(00)00339-X
by applicantWO9600237
 WO9837086
 US4456591
 WO0229084
 US4784950
 WO0104287
 US2003165996
 WO0158935
 WO03093465
 WO0202764
 US2003211094
 US5997864
 WO9215686
 US5580560
 WO02077218
 WO0238162
 WO9920767
 US6017882
 US6747003
 US2003100506
 WO0066753
 US2001018414
 US2004220106
 US6762286
 US6693075
 US6806063
 US2003096338
 WO2004029091
 WO0183725
 WO0222776
 WO03027147
 WO03037932
 JP2001061479
    - TOMOKIYO ET AL., VOX SANGUINIS, (2003), vol. 84, pages 54 - 64
    - WAKABAYASHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, page 11097
    - THIM ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 27, page 7785
    - OSTERUD ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 11, page 2853
    - HEDNER ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1983), vol. 71, page 1836
    - SCHARFENBERG ET AL., Animal Cell Technology Developments towards the 21st Century, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1995), pages 619 - 623
    - CRUZ, BIOTECHNOL. TECH., (1997), vol. 11, pages 117 - 120
    - KEEN, CYTOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 17, pages 203 - 211
    - BERG ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1993), vol. 14, pages 972 - 978
    - PERSSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 19919 - 19924
    - PERSSON, FEBS LETTS., (1997), vol. 413, pages 359 - 363
    - LINO ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1998), vol. 352, pages 182 - 192
    - MOLLERUP ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1995), vol. 48, pages 501 - 505
    - KORNFELT ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1999), vol. 363, pages 43 - 54
    - BJORN. S.; THIM, L., RES. DISCLOSURES, (1986), vol. 269, pages 564 - 565
    - PEDERSEN, A.H., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28, pages 9331 - 9336
    - TOMOKIYO, K., VOX SANG., (2003), vol. 84, pages 54 - 64
    - JURLANDER, B., SEMINARS IN THROMBOSIS AND HEMOSTASIS, (2001), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 373 - 383
otherWO9837086
 US5677162
    - BURNOUF T. ET AL, "Nanofiltration of plasma-derived biopharmaceutical products", HAEMOPHILIA, (2003), vol. 9, pages 24 - 37, XP001181709

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2516.2003.00701.x
    - JOSIC D. ET AL, "Manufacturing of a Prothrombin Complex Concentrate Aiming at Low Thrombogenicity", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 100, pages 433 - 441, XP003028450

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-3848(00)00339-X
    - SPECIFICATIONS DES CARTOUCHES UDV50, pages 1 - 3, XP003028451
    - DESCRIPTIF DU PRODUIT FEIBA NF, (20110705), pages 1 - 34, XP003028452