Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1709191

EP1709191 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR DETECTION OF LEISHMANIASIS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
All India Institute of Medical Sciences
Division of Clinical Microbiology Dept. of Laboratory Medicine Ansari Nagar
New Delhi 110029 / IN
For all designated states
Department of Biotechnology (a Department of the Government of India)
CGO Complex, Lodhi Road
New Delhi 110 003 / IN
[2006/41]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGH, Sarman, Dept. of Laboratory Medicine
All India Inst. of Medical Sciences,Ansari Nagar
New Delhi 110029 / IN
 [2006/41]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/41]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04806773.022.12.2004
[2006/41]
WO2004IN00395
Priority number, dateINDE1598200323.12.2003         Original published format: IN DE15982003
[2006/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005061729
Date:07.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1709191
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005
[2006/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1709191
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT07.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2006/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OLIGONUKLEOTIDE ZUM NACHWEIS VON LEISHMANIASE UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2006/41]
English:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR DETECTION OF LEISHMANIASIS AND METHODS THEREOF[2006/41]
French:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES SERVANT A DETECTER UNE LEISHMANIOSE, ET PROCEDES CORRESPONDANTS[2006/41]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2006National basic fee paid 
14.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/41]
24.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
05.06.2008Fee for grant paid
05.06.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
05.06.2008Request for further processing filed
05.06.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/15]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/51]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/11]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/51]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/44]AT25.02.2009
BE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/41]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
Former [2009/35]NL25.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003162182  (SALOTRA POONAM [IN], et al);
 [A]US5834592  (REED STEVEN G [US], et al)
 [A]  - BURNS J.M. ET AL, "Molecular characterization of a kinesin-related antigen of Leishmania chagasi that detects specific antibody in African and American visceral leishmaniasis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (19930115), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 775 - 779, XP002999744

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.2.775