Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1732108

EP1732108 - COATER/DEVELOPER AND COATING/DEVELOPING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.08.2014
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED
3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8481 / JP
[2013/39]
Former [2006/50]For all designated states
TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED
3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8481 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Taro
c/o Tokyo Electron Kyushu Limited
1-1, Fukuhara, Koshi-shi
Kumamoto 8611116 / JP
02 / Kyouda, Hideharu
c/o Tokyo Electron Kyushu Limited
Kumamoto Plant, 2655
Tsukure, Kikuyo-machi
Kikuchi-gun, Kumamoto 8691197 / JP
 [2013/07]
Former [2006/50]01 / Yamamoto, Taro, Tokyo Electron Kyushu Limited
1-1,Fukuhara, Koshi-shi
Kumamoto 8611116 / JP
02 / Kyouda, Hideharu, Tokyo Electron Kyushu Ltd.
Kumamoto Plant, 2655, Tsukure, Kikuyo-machi
Kikuchi-gun, Kumamoto 8691197 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2006/50]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date04807190.616.12.2004
[2006/50]
WO2004JP18831
Priority number, dateJP2004010719531.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004107195
[2006/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005101467
Date:27.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1732108
Date:13.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005
[2006/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1732108
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP27.10.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/16, G03F7/20, G03F7/30, H01L21/67, G03F7/38
[2012/52]
Former International [2009/08]H01L21/027, G03F7/38, H01L21/00
Former International [2006/50]H01L21/027, G03F7/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2007/27]
Former [2006/50]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTER/ENTWICKLER UND BESCHICHTUNGS-/ ENTWICKLUNGSVERFAHREN[2006/50]
English:COATER/DEVELOPER AND COATING/DEVELOPING METHOD[2006/50]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COUCHAGE OU DE DÉVELOPPEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUCHAGE OU DE DÉVELOPPEMENT[2006/50]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2006Translation filed 
06.09.2006National basic fee paid 
06.09.2006Search fee paid 
06.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
06.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/50]
15.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
26.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2012
12.11.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2013Fee for grant paid
12.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.10.2010
Opposition(s)26.06.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
09.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.09.2013
FR31.12.2013
[2014/51]
Former [2014/38]IT25.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003079764  (HIROSE KEIZO [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] *;
 [A]US6063439  (SEMBA NORIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH08314156  (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS5911628  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [Y]JP2003076018  (SUGITA KAZUYUKI, et al);
 [Y]JPH11260686  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]JPH10303114  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK);
 [Y]JPH1174195  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD);
 [Y]JP2003332213  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD);
 [Y]JP2004095705  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD)
ExaminationUS6443641
 US6558053
by applicantUS2003079764