Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1695276

EP1695276 - METHOD OF IMPROVING AIRLINE LUGGAGE INSPECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tropp, David
165, Norfolk Street
Brooklyn, NY 11235 / US
[2006/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/35]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB , et al
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Kuhnen & Wacker , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Postfach 19 64
85319 Freising / DE
Former [2011/13]Lang, Johannes , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2006/35]Altenburg, Udo
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date04809332.209.04.2004
[2006/35]
WO2004US11033
Priority number, dateUS2003070650012.11.2003         Original published format: US 706500
US2004075653112.01.2004         Original published format: US 756531
[2006/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005047626
Date:26.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1695276
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005
[2006/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:E05B37/02, E05B37/10, E05B67/24
[2011/20]
Former International [2006/35]G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FLUGLINIEN-GEPÄCKUNTERSUCHUNG[2006/35]
English:METHOD OF IMPROVING AIRLINE LUGGAGE INSPECTION[2006/35]
French:PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER L'INSPECTION DE BAGAGES TRANSPORTES PAR UNE COMPAGNIE AERIENNE[2006/35]
Entry into regional phase12.06.2006National basic fee paid 
12.06.2006Search fee paid 
12.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
14.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2012Observations by third parties
25.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination24.03.2016Appeal received No.  T1367/16
24.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP12179284.0  / EP2532812
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.07.2011
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
18.11.2013Request for further processing filed
18.11.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.12.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
07.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
11.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
09.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
20.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
05.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200704   M06   Fee paid on   23.08.2007
30.04.201007   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2010
30.04.201108   M06   Fee paid on   07.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2004104329  (STANTON CONCEPTS INC [US]; LOUGHLIN ROBERT [US]; LOUGHLIN JOHN [US]) [E] 1,3-5,7-10 * page 1, line 5 - page 10, line 26; figures 1-8e * * page 15, line 28 - line 34 * * page 30, line 25 - line 32 *;
 [E]EP1529907  (SUN LOCK COMPANY LTD [CN]) [E] 5-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0015] , [0016] , [0083]; figures 1-26 *;
 [E]WO2004113651  (STANTON CONCEPTS INC [US]) [E] 5,7-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 8, line 23; figures 1-9c * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 14 *
International search[Y]US4055972  (CALEGAN EVERETT L);
 [Y]US5237842  (RASCH ULF [DE], et al);
 [A]US6557384  (CUESTA JOHNNY M [US]);
 [AE]US2005081584  (NUGENT WALTER J [AU])
by applicantWO2004104329
otherUS2926514