Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1773434

EP1773434 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING NOISE IN A ROOTS-TYPE BLOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2011
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carefusion 203, Inc.
3750 Torrey View Court
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2010/31]
Former [2007/16]For all designated states
Pulmonetic Systems, Inc.
17400 Medina Road, Suite 100
Plymouth, MN 55447 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEVRIES, Douglas, F.
5812 NE Arrowhead Drive
Kenmore, WA 98028 / US
02 / WILLIAMS, Malcolm
P.O. Box 134
San Clemente, CA 92674 / US
 [2007/16]
Representative(s)Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Temple Chambers
3-7 Temple Avenue
London EC4Y 0DA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Richards, John , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2007/16]Gervasi, Gemma
Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04810758.510.11.2004
[2007/16]
WO2004US37659
Priority number, dateUS2004091274704.08.2004         Original published format: US 912747
[2007/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2006022787
Date:02.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1773434
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006
[2007/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1773434
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1773434
Date:18.08.2010
[2010/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00, F04C18/12, F04C29/00
[2008/13]
Former International [2007/16]A61M16/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR GERÄUSCHVERRINGERUNG IN EINEM GEBLÄSE VOM ROOTS TYP[2007/16]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING NOISE IN A ROOTS-TYPE BLOWER[2007/16]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A REDUIRE LE BRUIT D'UN COMPRESSEUR TYPE ROOTS[2007/16]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2007National basic fee paid 
27.02.2007Search fee paid 
27.02.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
30.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2010Fee for grant paid
20.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
BG16.09.2010
IS16.10.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/41]BG16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
IS16.10.2010
Former [2011/13]EE16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
IS16.10.2010
Former [2011/11]EE16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
Former [2011/09]EE16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
Former [2010/52]SI16.06.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3620792  (WANKEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 44 - line 48; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 16 - line 18 *;
 [X]DE3238015  (AERZENER MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 11, line 26 - line 32; figure 3 * * page 13, line 24 - line 28 *;
 [X]DE3414064  (AERZENER MASCHF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB2157370  (AERZENER MASCHF GMBH) [X] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[A]US6484719  (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU]);
 [A]US5823186  (ROSSEN THOMAS [DE], et al)
by applicantDE3238015
 US20040912747
 US20030492421