EP1689383 - NOVEL PHOSPHORUS-CONTAINING THYROMIMETICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metabasis Therapeutics, Inc. 11085 North Torrey Pines Road Suite 300 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2010/25] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Metabasis Therapeutics, Inc. 11119 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla CA 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERION, Mark, D. 13455 Mango Drive Del Mar, CA 92104 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Hongjian 13106 Sierra Mesa Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
BOYER, Serge, H. 5112 Castle Hills Drive San Diego, CA 92109 / US | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | Savic, Bojan Fleuchaus & Gallo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Melchiorstraße 42 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04811701.4 | 19.11.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004US39024 | Priority number, date | US20030523830P | 19.11.2003 Original published format: US 523830 P | US20040598524P | 03.08.2004 Original published format: US 598524 P | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005051298 | Date: | 09.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1689383 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1689383 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/30, A61K31/28, A61K31/445, A61K31/435, C07F9/06, A61P5/18 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
C07F9/4056 (EP,US);
C07F9/06 (KR);
A61K31/28 (KR);
A61K31/435 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F9/00 (KR);
C07F9/301 (EP,US);
C07F9/306 (EP,US);
C07F9/3808 (EP,US);
C07F9/3882 (EP,US);
C07F9/4006 (EP,US);
C07F9/4075 (EP,US);
C07F9/4407 (EP,US);
C07F9/4465 (EP,US);
C07F9/5728 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | A61K31/28, A61K31/445, A61K31/435, C07F9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | 19.06.2006 | HR | 19.06.2006 | LT | 19.06.2006 | LV | 19.06.2006 | MK | 19.06.2006 | YU | 19.06.2006 | Title | German: | NEUE PHOSPHOR ENTHALTENDE THYROMIMETIKA | [2006/33] | English: | NOVEL PHOSPHORUS-CONTAINING THYROMIMETICS | [2006/33] | French: | NOUVELLES SUBSTANCES THYROMIMETIQUES CONTENANT DU PHOSPHORE | [2006/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2012 | 31.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11192434.6 / EP2428516 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2004 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | IE | 19.11.2012 | LU | 19.11.2012 | SE | 20.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 31.01.2013 | GB | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | DE | 01.06.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 19.11.2012 | ||
LU | 19.11.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GB | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 19.11.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GB | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 19.11.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GB | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 19.11.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 19.11.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
DE | 01.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 19.11.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 20.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2004093799 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,43,48* examples 166,167; claim - *; | [X] - LACOSTE A M ET AL, "Synthèse er propriétés biologiques de l'analogue phosphonique de la thyroxine - Synthesis and biological properties of the phosphonic analog of thyroxine", COMPTES RENDUS HEBDOMADAIRES DES SEANCES DE L'ACADEMIE DESSCIENCES. SERIES D, SCIENCES NATURELLES, GAUTHIER-VILLARS, PARIS, FR, (19681125), vol. 267, no. 22, ISSN 0567-655X, pages 1890 - 1892, XP009074723 [X] 1,2,13,16,43,48 * page 1890 - page 1892 * | [X] - LACOSTE A M ET AL, "Recherches sur les acides aminoalkylphosphoniques. II. Dérivés iodés de l'analogue phosphonique de la tyrosine - Research on aminoalkylphosphonic acids. II. Iodine derivatives of the phosphonic analogue of tyrosine", BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE DE CHIMIE BIOLOGIGUE, MASSON, PARIS, FR, (19670101), vol. 49, no. 12, ISSN 0037-9042, pages 1827 - 1835, XP009074724 [X] 1,2,13,16,43,48 * page 1827 - page 1829 * | International search | [X]US6465687 (LI YI-LIN [SE], et al); | [X]US3357887 (FRED KAGAN, et al) | by applicant | US3357877 | US6465687 | WO2004093799 | - OH ET AL., J. NUTR., (1995), vol. 125, no. 1, pages 112 - 24 | - OH ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1994), vol. 207, no. 3, pages 260 - 7 | - UNDERWOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 425 - 9 | - STANTON ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2000), vol. 10, no. 15, pages 1661 - 3 | - DOW ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2003), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 379 - 82 | - DE BRUIN ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDO. METAB., (1993), vol. 76, pages 121 - 126 | - LACOSTE ET AL., BULL. SOC. CHIM. BIOL., (1967), vol. 49, no. 12, pages 1827 - 35 | - LACOSTE, C.R. ACAD. SC. PARIS, SERIE D, (1968), vol. 267, no. 22, pages 1890 - 2 |