EP1692150 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF PENTAERYTHRITOL DIPHOSPHITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dover Chemical Corporation 3676 Davis Road, NW Dover, Ohio 44622 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARKE, Carroll 996 Michael Lane Zoar, OH 44697 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Senior, Janet, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Senior, Janet, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04811847.5 | 23.11.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US39200 | Priority number, date | US20030707402 | 11.12.2003 Original published format: US 707402 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005060500 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1692150 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6574 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
C07F9/65746 (EP,US);
C07F9/6574 (KR);
C07F9/6571 (KR);
C07F9/65748 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | C07F9/6578 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PENTAERYTHRITDIPHOSPHITEN | [2006/34] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURE OF PENTAERYTHRITOL DIPHOSPHITES | [2006/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DIPHOSPHURES DE PENTAERYTHRITE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2847443 (INGENUIN HECHENBLEIKNER, et al) [Y] 1-7* example - *; | [Y]GB1002321 (PURE CHEM LTD) [Y] 1-7 * page 1 - page 15 *; | [Y]US3205250 (INGENUIN HECHENBLEIKNER) [Y] 1-7 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]GB1006580 (PURE CHEM LTD) [Y] 1-7 * page 1 - page 4 *; | [Y]GB1526603 (BORG WARNER) [Y] 1-7 * page 1 - page 5 *; | [Y]EP0226110 (BORG WARNER CHEMICALS INC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 1 - page 5 * | International search | [A]US5438086 (STEVENSON DONALD R [US], et al) |