Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1695121

EP1695121 - MICRO-OPTIC SECURITY AND IMAGE PRESENTATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.04.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visual Physics, LLC
1245 Old Alpharetta Road
Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US
[2009/23]
Former [2006/35]For all designated states
Nanoventions, Inc.
1245 Old Alpharetta Road
Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STEENBLIK, Richard, A.
PMB 244, POB 223300
Princeville, HI 96722 / US
02 / HURT, Mark, J.
2241 Makana Ano Place
Kilauea, HI 96754 / US
03 / JORDAN, Gregory, R.
1520 Dunn Road
Cumming, GA 30040 / US
 [2013/40]
Former [2011/38]01 / STEENBLIK, Richard, A.
PMB 244, POB 223300
Princeville, HI 96722 / US
02 / HURT, Mark, J.
3816 Turnberry Court
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
03 / JORDAN, Gregory, R.
1520 Dunn Road
Cumming, GA 30040 / US
Former [2006/35]01 / STEENBLIK, Richard, A.
235 Waters Mill Trail
Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US
02 / HURT, Mark, J.
3816 Turnberry Court
Duluth, GA 30096 / US
03 / JORDAN, Gregory, R.
1520 Dunn Road
Cumming, GA 30040 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB , et al
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/23]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser , et al
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2010/03]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät , et al
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2006/35]Mertens, Hans Victor , et al
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date04811944.022.11.2004
[2006/35]
WO2004US39315
Priority number, dateUS20030524281P21.11.2003         Original published format: US 524281 P
US20040538392P22.01.2004         Original published format: US 538392 P
US20040627234P12.11.2004         Original published format: US 627234 P
[2006/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005052650
Date:09.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1695121
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005
[2006/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1695121
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.05.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:B44F1/06, G02B27/06, B44F1/10, D21H21/44, G02B3/00, G02B27/22, B42D15/00
[2014/23]
Former International [2013/47]B44F1/06, G02B27/06, B44F1/10, B42D15/10, D21H21/44, G02B3/00, G02B27/22, B42D15/00
Former International [2010/47]B42D15/00, G02B27/22, G02B3/00
Former International [2006/35]G02B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/35]
TitleGerman:MIKROOPTISCHES SICHERHEITS- UND BILDPRÄSENTATIONSSYSTEM[2006/35]
English:MICRO-OPTIC SECURITY AND IMAGE PRESENTATION SYSTEM[2006/35]
French:SYSTEME DE SECURITE MICRO-OPTIQUE ET DE PRESENTATION D'IMAGE[2006/35]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2006National basic fee paid 
21.06.2006Search fee paid 
21.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
10.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
06.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2014Fee for grant paid
16.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10005511.0  / EP2258560
EP10006152.2  / EP2253478
EP10006153.0  / EP2253479
EP10006550.7  / EP2258561
EP10006551.5  / EP2253480
EP10014906.1  / EP2284016
EP10014947.5  / EP2284017
EP10014985.5  / EP2284018
EP10014992.1  / EP2332737
EP10014997.0  / EP2335944
EP10015043.2  / EP2311647
EP11000713.5  / EP2335943
EP11002546.7  / EP2397883
EP11002547.5  / EP2385412
EP11002548.3  / EP2388637
EP11004129.0  / EP2385413
EP11005720.5  / EP2384902
EP11008302.9  / EP2460667
EP12000092.2  / EP2474424
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2011
Opposition(s)05.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE04.06.2014
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
TR04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU22.11.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]BE04.06.2014
BG04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU22.11.2014
Former [2015/36]BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU22.11.2014
Former [2015/32]BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU22.11.2014
Former [2015/30]BE04.06.2014
CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU22.11.2014
Former [2015/12]CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
IS04.10.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
RO04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY04.06.2014
EE04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
SK04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY04.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US5800907  (YUMOTO YOSHIHIDE [JP]) [A] 1 * column 30 - lines 50-67 * * column 11 - lines 45-67; figure 6 *;
 [I]WO9427254  (DE LA RUE HOLOGRAPHICS LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-4,10-15,17,18,24,26 * page 4 - lines 1-17 * * pages 22-23; figures 1a-1e *;
 [A]US2003179364  (STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0060] - [0062] - [0184]; figures 29,30,42 *;
 [I]US2003112523  (DANIELL STEPHEN [US]) [I] 1-4,10-15,17,18,24,26 * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] - [0125] - [0131] - [0220] - [0272]; figures 2, 9-11, 17-19 * * lens array with aspherical elements, flat field,; paragraphs [0193] - [0201] *
International search[XT]US6900944  (TOMCZYK JOHN [US]);
 [XT]US6870681  (MAGEE JOHN ALLAN [US])
ExaminationJPH04234699
 US3241429
by applicantUS5712731