Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1711802

EP1711802 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING ELECTROCHEMICAL ANALYTE SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.06.2010
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DexCom, Inc.
5555 Oberlin Drive San Diego
California 92121 / US
[2006/42]
Inventor(s)01 / SIMPSON, Peter, C.
1236 Stratford Court
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / BRAUKER, James, H.
10831 Riesling Drive
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
03 / CARR-BRENDEL, Victoria
3735 Grillo Court
Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US
04 / GOODE, JR., Paul, V.
39724 Via Las Palmas
Murrieta, CA 92563 / US
05 / TAPSAK, Mark
247 Asbury Road
Orangeville, PA 17859 / US
 [2006/42]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2012/02]Klusmann, Peter
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2006/42]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date04813255.907.12.2004
[2006/42]
WO2004US40913
Priority number, dateUS20030527892P08.12.2003         Original published format: US 527892 P
US20040587787P13.07.2004         Original published format: US 587787 P
US20040614683P30.09.2004         Original published format: US 614683 P
[2006/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005057173
Date:23.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/25]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1711802
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005
[2006/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1711802
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.04.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/327, C12Q1/00, G01N33/487
[2008/41]
Former International [2006/42]G01N27/327
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG ELEKTROCHEMISCHER ANALYTSENSOREN[2006/42]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING ELECTROCHEMICAL ANALYTE SENSORS[2006/42]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES AMELIORANT DE CAPTEURS D'ANALYTES ELECTROCHIMIQUES[2006/42]
Entry into regional phase15.08.2006National basic fee paid 
15.08.2006Search fee paid 
15.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
15.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/42]
16.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
04.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2010Fee for grant paid
03.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10164999.4  / EP2228642
EP17176101.8  / EP3241490
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.03.2011  08.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Duxbury, Stephen, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bavariaring 17
80336 München / DE
 02  14.04.2011  21.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB, et al
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [2016/16]
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  30.03.2011  08.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Duxbury, Stephen, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bavariaring 17
80336 München / DE
 02  14.04.2011  21.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann, et al
Postfach 860 820
DE-81679 München / DE
Former [2011/20]
Opponent(s)01  30.03.2011  08.04.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Duxbury, Stephen, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37
80336 München / DE
 02  14.04.2011   
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Silber, Anton, et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Former [2011/18]
Opponent(s)01  30.03.2011   
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Duxbury, Stephen, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37
80336 München / DE
23.05.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.12.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0395/15
27.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
18.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0395/15
14.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
29.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
TR14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
IE07.12.2010
LU07.12.2010
CH31.12.2010
LI31.12.2010
MC31.12.2010
HU15.01.2011
IT07.12.2012
[2014/03]
Former [2011/36]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
MC31.12.2010
Former [2011/32]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/23]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/19]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/16]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/15]AT14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/13]AT14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
IS14.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/11]AT14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
PL14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/08]AT14.07.2010
LT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2005012871  (DEXCOM INC [US]; SIMPSON PETER C [US]; GOODE PAUL [US]) [E] 13-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5411647  (JOHNSON KIRK W [US], et al);
 [Y]US5352351  (WHITE BRADLEY E [US], et al);
 [Y]US5034112  (MURASE ISAO [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4750496  (REINHART RICHARD [US], et al);
 [Y]  - BARD ET AL, Electrochemical Methods, (1980), pages 173 - 175, XP008061435
 [A]  - MOATTI-SIRAT D. ET AL, "Evaluating in vitro and in vivo the interference of ascorbate and acetaminophen on glucose detection by a needle-type glucose sensor", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, (1992), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 345 - 352, XP002996116

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0956-5663(92)85030-E
 [A]  - TIERNEY M.J. ET AL, "Effect of Acetaminophen on the Accuracy of Glucose Measurements Obtained with the GlucoWatch Biographer", DIABETES TECHNOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (2000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 199 - 207, XP008061439

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/15209150050025140
by applicantUS5411647
 US6001067
 US2003032874
 US4994167
 US4757022
    - LERNER, H. ET AL.: "An implantable electrochemical glucose sensor", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, vol. 428, 1984, pages 263 - 278
    - SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, vol. B, 1995, pages 181 - 189
 US20030647065
 US20030633367
 US20010916386
 US20010916711
 US19990447227
 US20000489588
 US20000636369
 US20010916858