Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1773646

EP1773646 - VEHICLE WITH IMPROVED TURNING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.11.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.12.2009  [2009/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electric Mobility Corporation
One Mobility Plaza
Sewell, NJ 08080 / US
[2007/16]
Inventor(s)01 / FLOWERS, Michael, J.
2 Shannon Lane
Mantua, NJ 08051 / US
02 / JAREMA, Stephen, III
86 Pine Avenue
Pittsgrove, NJ 08318 / US
03 / DWYER, Edward, J., Jr.
427 Upperneck Road
Pittsgrove, NJ 08318 / US
04 / HOPELY, Robert, C., Jr.
154 Franklin Street
Sewell, NJ 08085 / US
05 / ZAVELOFF, David, S.
600 Prince Street
Bordentown, NJ 08505 / US
06 / MARTIN, Robert, M.
204 Wooden Bridge Road
Holland, PA 18966 / US
 [2007/16]
Representative(s)Borchert, Uwe Rudolf , et al
Puschmann Borchert Bardehle
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 10 12 31
80086 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/16]Borchert, Uwe Rudolf , et al
Postfach 10 12 31
80086 München / DE
Application number, filing date04813693.127.12.2004
[2007/16]
WO2004US41406
Priority number, dateUS20040535318P09.01.2004         Original published format: US 535318 P
[2007/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005069778
Date:04.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1773646
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005
[2007/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:B62D11/04
[2007/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/16]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG MIT VERBESSERTER WENDUNG[2007/16]
English:VEHICLE WITH IMPROVED TURNING[2007/16]
French:VEHICULE A BRAQUAGE AMELIORE[2007/16]
Entry into regional phase09.08.2006National basic fee paid 
09.08.2006Search fee paid 
09.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.08.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2006Examination requested  [2007/16]
01.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/53]
12.08.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200805   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5503244  ;
 [A]US6601123  ;
 [A]US5259470