Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1696845

EP1696845 - HYBRID EYE TRACKING SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcon RefractiveHorizons, Inc.
6201 South Freeway Mail Code Q-148
Fort Worth, Texas 76134 / US
[2006/36]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAY, Gary
12859 Sharp Shined Street
Orlando, FL 32837 / US
02 / CAMPIN, John, A.
14313 N. Berwick Court
Orlando, FL 32828 / US
03 / BOTT, Steven, E.
472 West Palm Valley Drive
Oviedo, FL 32765 / US
04 / GIBBS, David, Michael
12502 Lake Mary Jane Road
Orlando, FL 32832 / US
05 / PETTIT, George, H.
70 Oakleigh Lane
Maitland, FL 32751 / US
 [2006/36]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]Hanna, Peter William Derek
Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date04815239.123.12.2004
[2006/36]
WO2004US43130
Priority number, dateUS20030532041P23.12.2003         Original published format: US 532041 P
[2006/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005063154
Date:14.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1696845
Date:06.09.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005
[2006/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1696845
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/01
[2006/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYBRID-AUGENVERFOLGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERWANDTE VERFAHREN[2006/36]
English:HYBRID EYE TRACKING SYSTEM AND ASSOCIATED METHODS[2006/36]
French:SYSTEME DE SUIVEUR OCULAIRE HYBRIDE ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES[2006/36]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2006National basic fee paid 
21.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.06.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/37]
22.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/15]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/11]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/51]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/44]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/41]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
LT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6607527  (RUIZ LUIS ANTONIO [CO], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,21-24,27,28,33,34 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 34 * * column 11, line 15 - line 18; figure 8; claims 1,2,6 * [A] 5,6,9-20,25,26,29-32,35-40;
 [XA]US5098426  (SKLAR H ALFRED [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,21,23-25,41-43 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 61 * * column 9, line 14 - line 16 * * column 10, line 17 - line 52 * * column 22, line 23 - column 23, line 18; figures 1,4,5,5A,8; claim 1 * [A] 2,17,22,27-29,37,40;
 [XA]US6658282  (EAGAN BARRY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,21,23,24 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 50; claims 1,4 * [A] 2,6-8,10,22,26,28;
 [XY]US2002013577  (FREY RUDOLPH W [US], et al) [X] 1,41 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 8 * * page 2, paragraph 23 - page 3, paragraph 35 * * page 4, paragraph 38 - paragraph 45; figures 1,5; claim 1 * [Y] 7,21,27,42;
 [Y]US6280436  (FREEMAN JERRE M [US], et al) [Y] 7,21,27,42 * abstract *
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "What is true custom ablation?", EUROTIMES, Dublin, vol. supplement, (200210), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.escrs.org/eurotimes/october2002/supplement/supplement.asp, (20050802), XP002339208 [X] 1-43 * Closed-loop eye tracking essential for proper registration of custom ablation; page 5 - page 11 *