Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1639609

EP1639609 - NOVEL SUPERCONDUCTING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/13]NOVEL SUPERCONDUCTING ARTICLES, AND METHODS FOR FORMING AND USING SAME
[2013/16]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Superpower, Inc.
450 Duane Avenue
Schenectady, NY 12304 / US
[2006/13]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Hee-Gyoun
105 Guilder Lane 5
Guilderland, New York 12084 / US
02 / XIE, Yi-Yuan
22C Meadowbrook Ct.
Guilderland, New York 12084 / US
 [2006/13]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/39]Leidescher, Thomas , et al
Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2006/13]Leidescher, Thomas , et al
Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Application number, filing date04817705.925.06.2004
[2006/13]
WO2004US20558
Priority number, dateUS2003060794527.06.2003         Original published format: US 607945
[2006/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005055275
Date:16.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1639609
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1639609
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.12.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01B12/00, H01F6/00, H01L39/14
[2013/15]
Former International [2006/13]H01B12/00, H01F6/00, H01L39/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/13]
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE SUPRALEITENDE ARTIKEL[2013/16]
English:NOVEL SUPERCONDUCTING ARTICLES[2013/16]
French:NOUVEAUX ARTICLES SUPRACONDUCTEURS[2013/16]
Former [2006/13]NEUARTIGE SUPRALEITENDE ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG
Former [2006/13]NOVEL SUPERCONDUCTING ARTICLES, AND METHODS FOR FORMING AND USING SAME
Former [2006/13]NOUVEAUX ARTICLES SUPRACONDUCTEURS, ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION
Entry into regional phase23.12.2005National basic fee paid 
23.12.2005Search fee paid 
23.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/13]
09.03.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2013Fee for grant paid
16.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.04.2014  28.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Theva Dünnschichttechnik GmbH
Rote-Kreuz-Str. 8
85737 Ismaning / DE
Opponent's representative
Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
 02  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.2014  28.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Theva Dünnschichttechnik GmbH
Rote-Kreuz-Str. 8
85737 Ismaning / DE
Opponent's representative
Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
 02  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2014/22]
Opponent(s)01  14.04.2014   
Theva Dünnschichttechnik GmbH
Rote-Kreuz-Str. 8
85737 Ismaning / DE
Opponent's representative
Wegner, Hans
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
28.08.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1183/16
25.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.06.2004
AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
TR25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
IE25.06.2014
LU25.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU25.06.2004
AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
IE25.06.2014
LU25.06.2014
Former [2016/25]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
BG25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
IE25.06.2014
LU25.06.2014
Former [2015/21]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
IE25.06.2014
LU25.06.2014
Former [2015/09]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
MC25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
LU25.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
DK25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
IT25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
PT27.01.2014
Former [2014/26]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CY25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/24]AT25.09.2013
BE25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
ES25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
PL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/23]BE25.09.2013
CZ25.09.2013
EE25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
SK25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/22]BE25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
NL25.09.2013
RO25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE25.09.2013
FI25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/12]FI25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
SI25.09.2013
GR26.12.2013
Former [2014/11]FI25.09.2013
SE25.09.2013
Former [2014/09]SE25.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH07335051  (CHODENDO HATSUDEN KANREN KIKI) [X] 1-5,7-12,15,16,20,21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0022]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 6,13,14,17-19;
 [Y]WO0058530  (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 6,14 * page 8, lines 1-13; figures 2,4,5 *;
 [Y]WO0108169  (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 13,17,18 * page 1, lines 6-16 * * page 3, lines 11-13 * * page 14, line 18 *;
 [Y]EP0398374  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 13 * column 3, lines 33-36 * * column 3, lines 48-53 *;
 [Y]WO0152393  (AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 19 * page 1, line 27 - page 5, line 12 *
International search[A]US6309767  ;
 [A]US6271474  ;
 [A]US6187166  ;
 [A]US5480861  ;
 [A]US4652346  ;
 [A]US4560445  ;
 [A]US3954572
ExaminationUS3720777
    - AHN M C ET AL, "Current limiting characteristics of coated conductors with various stabilizers", CRYOGENICS, ELSEVIER, KIDLINGTON, GB, (20070701), vol. 47, no. 7-8, ISSN 0011-2275, pages 425 - 430, XP027144686