Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1711278

EP1711278 - POLYHEDRAL OLIGOMERIC SILSESQUIOXANES AND METALLIZED POLYHEDRAL OLIGOMERIC SILSESQUIOXANES AS COATINGS, COMPOSITES AND ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.10.2013  [2013/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hybrid Plastics LLP
55 W. L. Runnels Industrial Drive
Hattiesburg, MS 39401 / US
[2006/42]
Inventor(s)01 / LICHTENHAN, Joseph, D.
2 Chestnut Point
Petal, MS 39401 / US
02 / FU, Xuan
15, Timber Ridge
Purvis, mississippi 39475 / US
03 / LECLAIR, Steven, R.
43, Leafy Knoll way
Johnstown, Ohio 43031 / US
 [2007/26]
Former [2006/42]01 / LICHTENHAN, Joseph, D.
2 Chestnut Point
Petal, MS 39401 / US
02 / FU, Xuan
4124 W. 4th Street,Apt. 1508
Hattiesburg, MS 39401 / US
03 / LECLAIR, Steven, R.
4 Bookham Court
Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US
Representative(s)Hatt, Anna Louise
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/42]Hatt, Anna Louise
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date04818048.317.12.2004
[2006/42]
WO2004US42422
Priority number, dateUS20030531458P18.12.2003         Original published format: US 531458 P
[2006/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005060671
Date:07.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1711278
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005
[2006/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.02.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/02, B05D7/00, C23C18/12, C07F7/22, H01L21/4763, H01L23/29
[2012/37]
Former International [2006/42]B05D3/02, B05D7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/42]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYHEDRISCHE OLIGOMERE SILSESQUIOXANE UND METALLISIERTE POLYHEDRISCHE OLIGOMERE SILSEQUIOXANE ALS BESCHICHTUNGEN, VERBINDUNGEN UND ADDITIVE[2006/42]
English:POLYHEDRAL OLIGOMERIC SILSESQUIOXANES AND METALLIZED POLYHEDRAL OLIGOMERIC SILSESQUIOXANES AS COATINGS, COMPOSITES AND ADDITIVES[2006/42]
French:SILSESQUIOXANES OLIGOMERIQUES POLYEDRES ET SILSESQUIOXANES OLIGOMERIQUES POLYEDRES METALLISES EN TANT QUE REVETEMENTS, COMPOSITES ET ADDITIFS[2006/42]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2006National basic fee paid 
12.07.2006Search fee paid 
12.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/42]
30.09.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/40]
15.05.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200603   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2007
31.12.201209   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO0172885  (HYBRID PLASTICS LLP [US]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1295903  (ORIENT CHEMICAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0036]; claims 1-20 *;
 [AP]JP2004307738  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [AP] 1-17 * abstract *
International search[X]US5472927  (MULDER ALETTA [NL], et al);
 [A]US6425936  (SAMMONS JACK [US], et al)