Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1694890

EP1694890 - ARAMID FIBRILS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teijin Aramid B.V.
Westervoortsedijk 73
6827 AV Arnhem / NL
[2007/52]
Former [2006/35]For all designated states
Teijin Twaron B.V.
Westervoortsedijk 73
6827 AV Arnhem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HENDRIKS, Anton, Johannes, Josef
Dr. Ariensstraat 8
NL-6663 AL Lent / NL
02 / TIECKEN, Jan, Davis, Cornelis
Meeuwstraat 23
NL-6942 KK Didam / NL
03 / GROTENDORST, Harrie
Golden Delicious 47
NL-6922 AP Duiven / NL
04 / JOURNEE, René
Lombarts 2
NL-6922 AN Duiven / NL
05 / OLDENZEEL, Mirjam, Ellen
Grobbenhof 7
NL-6932 CK Westervoort / NL
 [2006/35]
Representative(s)Heimann, Anette
CPW GmbH
Kasinostrasse 19-21
42103 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/35]Heimann, Anette
CPW GmbH, Kasinostrasse 19-21
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date04820409.330.11.2004
[2006/35]
WO2004EP13542
Priority number, dateEP2003002809109.12.2003         Original published format: EP 03028091
[2006/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005059211
Date:30.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1694890
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005
[2006/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1694890
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:D01F6/60
[2006/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARAMIDFIBRILLEN[2006/35]
English:ARAMID FIBRILS[2006/35]
French:FIBRILLES ARAMIDE[2006/35]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2006National basic fee paid 
10.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
25.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2008Fee for grant paid
23.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2010/51]EE11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2010/11]EE11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/51]EE11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
IS11.06.2009
Former [2009/41]IS11.06.2009
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0348996  (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1-7 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 19 * * page 9, line 14 - line 30 *;
 [A]EP0381206  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 25; figures 1,4,5; examples 3,7,8 *;
 [A]US5442003  (TAKAHASHI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-13 *