Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1827336

EP1827336 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[2007/36]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHANSSON, Marie
Skogsbackevägen 17
S-435 37 Mölnlycke / SE
02 / ASP, Fredrik
Boklundsvägen 5
S-439 35 Onsala / SE
03 / JANSSON, Filip
Karl Gustavsgatan 46
S-411 31 Göteborg / SE
 [2007/36]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2016/33]
Former [2013/26]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2007/36]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date04822520.530.11.2004
[2007/36]
WO2004SE01759
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006059922
Date:08.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1827336
Date:05.09.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2006
[2007/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1827336
Date:26.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1827336
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/47, A61F13/49, A61K35/32, A61K38/30
[2012/25]
Former International [2007/36]A61F13/15, A61F13/533
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/33]
Former [2007/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL[2007/36]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2007/36]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT[2007/36]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2007National basic fee paid 
29.06.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2007Examination requested  [2007/36]
22.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2013Fee for grant paid
15.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  24.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  24.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
30.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.11.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.07.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
21.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.11.2004
AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
TR26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
LU30.11.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
TR26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH30.11.2013
IE30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
MC26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
DK26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CY26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
NL26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
RO26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
CZ26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
SK26.06.2013
CY24.07.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
IS26.10.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT26.06.2013
BE26.06.2013
EE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE26.06.2013
FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
PT28.10.2013
Former [2013/50]FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
BG26.09.2013
GR27.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI26.06.2013
SE26.06.2013
SI26.06.2013
GR27.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]US5895380  (TURI MORDECHAI [US], et al);
 [A]EP1210926  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [A]US6440115  (CONNELLY THOMAS JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]EP0769284  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [A]GB2319730  (KAO CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP1008333  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP])
by applicantEP0758543
 EP0734240
 WO9500763
 US6563013
 EP1384459
 EP1035818
 EP0969784
 WO2004SE01004
OppositionWO9516418
 DE3205931
 WO2004084784
 JPH09173381
 EP1486189