Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1553492

EP1553492 - On-device application catalog updated by management servers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.01.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/17]
Former [2005/28]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hofmeister, Nick
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052 / US
02 / Amiga, Ori
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052 / US
03 / Waite, Ryan
c/o Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way
Redmond WA 98052 / US
 [2005/28]
Representative(s)CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/49]Fischer, Michael Maria , et al
Olswang Gemany LLP
Maximilianstraße 13
80539 München / DE
Former [2005/28]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05000251.807.01.2005
[2005/28]
Priority number, dateUS2004075487809.01.2004         Original published format: US 754878
[2005/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1553492
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1553492
Date:31.10.2007
[2007/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/445
[2005/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/28]
TitleGerman:Anwendungskatalog auf einem Gerät aktualisiert von Verwaltungsservern[2005/28]
English:On-device application catalog updated by management servers[2005/28]
French:Catalogue d'applications sur un dispositif mis à jour par des serveurs de gestion[2005/28]
Examination procedure19.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/01]
18.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP1248188  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-12,14,15,18-21,23,24,27 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0062] * [A] 4,13,22 [Y] 7,8,16,17,25,26;
 [Y]US2003032417  (MINEAR BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,16,17,25,26 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016]; figures 4,5 *;
 [XA]WO2004003708  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,10,11,14,19,23 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] * [A] 3,4,6-9,12,13,15-18,20-22,24-27
by applicantEP1248188
 WO03010932
 US2003032417