Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1557300

EP1557300 - Trailer hitch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACPS Automotive GmbH
Steinbeisstrasse 6
71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2019/35]For all designated states
Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V.
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5
4131 PK Vianen / NL
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Former [2012/14]For all designated states
SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE HANS RIEHLE GmbH
Im Bornrain
71696 Möglingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rimmelspacher, Bernhard
Gartenstrasse 11
76287 Rheinstetten / DE
02 / Gentner, Wolfgang
Karlstrasse 28
71254 Ditzingen / DE
03 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstrasse 37
71679 Asperg / DE
04 / Mayer, Günther
Haydnweg 3
74357 Bönnigheim / DE
05 / Beringer, Hans-Peter
Achalmstrasse 159
73734 Esslingen / DE
 [2005/30]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2005/30]HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date05001066.920.01.2005
[2005/30]
Priority number, dateDE2004100450422.01.2004         Original published format: DE102004004504
[2005/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1557300
Date:27.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1557300
Date:04.04.2012
Language:DE
[2012/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/54, B60D1/26
[2017/09]
Former International [2005/30]B60D1/54
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/30]
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2005/30]
English:Trailer hitch[2005/30]
French:Attache remorque[2005/30]
Examination procedure30.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/48]
08.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.07.2011
11.07.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
13.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2012Fee for grant paid
23.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.11.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.12.2012   
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohlmann, Kai
Donatusstraße 1
52078 Aachen / DE
 [2013/06]
12.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.07.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2016
07.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition14.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0638/17
14.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0638/17
13.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.01.2005
CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
TR04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
AT20.01.2013
IE20.01.2013
LU20.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
TR04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
AT20.01.2013
IE20.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2014/24]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
AT20.01.2013
IE20.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2014/07]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
IE20.01.2013
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/49]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
BE31.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/34]CY04.04.2012
CZ04.04.2012
DK04.04.2012
EE04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
IT04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
RO04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
SK04.04.2012
BG04.07.2012
GR05.07.2012
ES15.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
Former [2013/01]CY04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
PT06.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
GR05.07.2012
IS04.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY04.04.2012
FI04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
PL04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
SI04.04.2012
IS04.08.2012
Former [2012/48]FI04.04.2012
LT04.04.2012
SE04.04.2012
Former [2012/47]LT04.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2450167  (OPPERMANN RENE) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-22,25-29,33,35-37,42,43,52-55,58 * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]DE20003480U  (SAUERMANN HANS [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 11, paragraph 2 *;
 [AP]DE10243045  (FAC FRANK ABELS CONSULT & TECH [DE]) [AP] 1
by applicantFR2450167