Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1686495

EP1686495 - Mapping web services to ontologies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ontoprise GmbH
Amalienbadstrasse 36
(Raumfabrik 29)
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/20]For all designated states
Ontoprise GmbH
Amalienbadstrasse 36/Raumfabrik 29
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
For all designated states
Software AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2006/31]For all designated states
Ontoprise GmbH
Amalienbadstrasse 36/Raumfabrik 29
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
For all designated states
SOFTWARE AG
Uhlandstrasse 12
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Angele, Jürgen
Speiertsgasse 28b
76863 Herxheim / DE
02 / Harbarth, Jürgen
Nieder-Ramstädter-Strasse 186 G
64285 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
04 / Waterfeld, Walter
Bernhardtstr. 12
64367 Mühltal / DE
05 / Winkler, Kay
Dieburgerstrasse 78
64287 Darmstadt / DE
06 / Gesmann, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2011/11]
Former [2009/47]01 / Angele, Jürgen
Bismarckstrasse 19
76870 Kandel / DE
02 / Harbarth, Jürgen
Nieder-Ramstädter-Strasse 186 G
64285 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
04 / Waterfeld, Walter
Hügelstrasse 35
64367 Darmstadt / DE
05 / Winkler, Kay
Dieburgerstrasse 78
64287 Darmstadt / DE
06 / Gesmann, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Former [2006/31]01 / Angele, Jürgen
Bismarckstrasse 19
76870 Kandel / DE
02 / Harbarth, Jürgen
Nieder-Ramstädter-Strasse 186 G
64285 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Schöning, Harald
Theobaldstrasse 36
64807 Dieburg / DE
04 / Waterfeld, Walter
Hügelstrasse 35
64367 Darmstadt / DE
05 / Winkler, Kay
Dieburgerstrasse 78
64287 Darmstadt / DE
06 / Gesman, Michael
Bellenweg 3
64297 Darmstadt / DE
Representative(s)Köllner, Malte , et al
Köllner & Partner Patentanwälte Vogelweidstrasse 8
60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2011/20]
Former [2006/31]Köllner, Malte , et al
Köllner & Partner Patentanwälte Vogelweidstrasse 8
60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date05001913.231.01.2005
[2006/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1686495
Date:02.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1686495
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2006/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/31]
TitleGerman:Abbilden von Web-Diensten auf Ontologien[2006/31]
English:Mapping web services to ontologies[2006/31]
French:Mappage de service sur des ontologies[2006/31]
Examination procedure01.11.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/31]
28.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2011Fee for grant paid
04.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200703   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.01.2005
AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
TR18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH31.01.2012
IE31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
LU31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
TR18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH31.01.2012
IE31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
LU31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2014/21]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
TR18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH31.01.2012
IE31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH31.01.2012
IE31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/08]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH31.01.2012
IE31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/49]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/37]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
IT18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/11]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/10]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/09]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT18.05.2011
BE18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
NL18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT18.05.2011
CY18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
ES29.08.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2011/47]LT18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004139095  (TRASTOUR DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0100]; figures 3a,4-6 *;
 [XA]  FERDINAND, M ET ALL, "Lifting XML Schema to OWL", ICWE 2004, PROCEEDINGS, (20040620), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://vsis-www.informatik.uni-hamburg.de/publications/view.php/204, (20050613), XP002332099 [X] 1,6,10-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 22 - line 39 * * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 23 * [A] 2-5,7-9
 [XA]  KRUPNIKOV A ET AL, "Data Binding Using W3C XML Schema Annotations", IDEALLIANCE.COM, (20040306), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.idealliance.org/papers/xml2001/papers/pdf/06-03-04.pdf, (20050612), XP002332100 [X] 1,6,10-17 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 2 * * page 3 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 15 * * page 7 * [A] 2-5,7-9
 [A]  JUN SHEN ET AL, "Mapping web services specifications to process ontology: opportunities and limitations", DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. FTDCS 2004. 10TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON FUTURE TRENDS OF SUZHOU, CHINA 26-28 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040526), ISBN 0-7695-2118-5, pages 229 - 235, XP010710885 [A] 6-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FTDCS.2004.1316621
 [A]  TRASTOUR D ET AL, "Using semantic web technology to enhance current business-to-business integration approaches", ENTERPRISE DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING CONFERENCE, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. SEVENTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL 16-19 SEPT. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030916), ISBN 0-7695-1994-6, pages 222 - 231, XP010659494 [A] 6-9 * the whole document *