blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1686495 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1686495



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 489
17.09.2012 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.08.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.04.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 13
04.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
04.04.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
04.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.02.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.01.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
19.01.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.01.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 68
24.09.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
14.10.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.10.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
08.10.2009 Claims Search / examination 8
08.10.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.08.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.08.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.04.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
07.04.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.09.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
11.08.2008 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 2
04.09.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
04.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 8
04.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 8
04.09.2007 Description Search / examination 11
04.09.2007 Description Search / examination 11
04.09.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.07.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.03.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
28.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.02.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.08.2006 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
05.07.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
07.04.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 71
06.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.11.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
03.11.2005 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
03.11.2005 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
03.11.2005 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.11.2005 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
01.11.2005 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 20
01.11.2005 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 3
27.06.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.06.2005 European search report Search / examination 3
22.06.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.05.2005 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
17.05.2005 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2005 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
28.04.2005 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.02.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.02.2005 Claims Search / examination 8
17.02.2005 Description Search / examination 59
17.02.2005 Drawings Search / examination 3
17.02.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.02.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
31.01.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
31.01.2005 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 71