blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1686495


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
30.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.07.2014  [2014/27]
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
14.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
18.01.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2013  [2013/08]
02.11.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
10.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
04.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
23.03.2012 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.04.2012  [2012/17]
10.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]
03.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
27.01.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
09.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.01.2012  [2012/02]
02.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
25.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
18.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2011  [2011/51]
11.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2011  [2011/50]
04.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
28.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]
21.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]
15.04.2011 (Expected) grant published on  18.05.2011  [2011/20]
11.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.02.2011 Change - inventor published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
28.01.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.01.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.01.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.10.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.10.2009 Change - inventor published on  18.11.2009  [2009/47]
11.08.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.04.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.09.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.07.2007 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.05.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
22.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.03.2007 Definitive list of designations published on  11.04.2007  [2007/15]
02.03.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.03.2007 First examination report
24.02.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.06.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.08.2006  [2006/31]
30.06.2006 Request for examination filed published on  02.08.2006  [2006/31]
02.03.2006 Amendment by applicant
09.11.2005 Amendment by applicant