Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1529534

EP1529534 - Use of GLP-1 peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.04.2010
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 05.05.2010  [2010/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsværd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2005/19]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Knudsen, Liselotte Bjerre
Svallerup Sovej 16
4400 Kalundborg / DK
02 / Thim, Lars
Skiftevej 22
2820 Gentofte / DK
03 / Judge, Martin Edward
Borgergade 134,4th
1300 Copenhagen K / DK
04 / Holst, Jens Juul
Ole Olsens Allé 30
2900 Hellerup / DK
05 / Astrup, Arne Vernon
Fabritius Allé 4
2930 Klampenborg / DK
06 / Wulff, Brigitte Schellerup
Parkvej 28
2830 Virum / DK
 [2005/45]
Former [2005/31]01 / Knudsen, Liselotte Bjerre
Valby Langgade 49A,1.tv.
2500 Valby / DK
02 / Thim, Lars
Skiftevej 22
2820 Gentofte / DK
03 / Judge, Martin Edward
Borgergade 134,4th
1300 Copenhagen K / DK
04 / Holst, Jens Juul
Ole Olsens Allé 30
2900 Hellerup / DK
05 / Astrup, Arne Vernon
Fabritius Allé 4
2930 Klampenborg / DK
06 / Wulff, Brigitte Schellerup
Parkvej 28
2830 Virum / DK
Former [2005/19]01 / Knudsen, Liselotte Bjerre
Valby Langgade 49A,1.tv.
2500 Valby / DK
02 / Thim, Lars
Skiftevej 22
2820 Gentofte / DK
03 / Judge, Martin Edward
Vendersgade 22,4.tv.
1363 Copenhagen K / DK
04 / Holst, Jens Juul
Ole Olsens Allé 30
2900 Hellerup / DK
05 / Astrup, Arne Vernon
Fabritius Allé 4
2930 Klampenborg / DK
06 / Wulff, Brigitte Schellerup
Parkvej 28
2830 Virum / DK
Representative(s)Thomas, Philip John Duval , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Thomas, Philip John Duval , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2005/19]Stahr, Pia , et al
Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Patents, Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date05002085.807.11.1997
[2005/19]
Priority number, dateDK1996000127012.11.1996         Original published format: DK 127096
[2005/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1529534
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1529534
Date:08.06.2005
[2005/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1529534
Date:11.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/26, A61P3/04
[2005/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2005/19]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von GLP-1 Peptiden[2005/19]
English:Use of GLP-1 peptides[2005/19]
French:Utilisation de peptide GLP-1[2005/19]
Examination procedure08.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/05]
10.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2007Fee for grant paid
15.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97911155.6  / EP0941114
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.04.2008   
AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
9360 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Taormino, Joseph Paul, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/21]
Opponent(s)01  11.04.2008   
AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
9360 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Opponent's representative
Taormino, Joseph Paul, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
03.06.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
04.12.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/18]
15.12.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.12.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
IE07.11.2007
LU07.11.2007
PT11.12.2007
[2009/41]
Former [2008/48]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
IE07.11.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/28]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
SE11.10.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/22]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
DK11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/21]AT11.07.2007
BE11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
GR12.10.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/14]AT11.07.2007
CH11.07.2007
FI11.07.2007
LI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
PT11.12.2007
Former [2008/11]FI11.07.2007
NL11.07.2007
PT11.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9731943  (NOVO NORDISK A/S) [PX] 1-19 * claims 1-24 * * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 18 *;
 [X]US5118666  (HABENER ET AL) [X] 16,17 * examples 1-10 * * claims 1-21 *;
 [E]WO9819698  (ELI LILLY AND COMPANY) [E] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - TURTON M D ET AL, A ROLE FOR GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-1 IN THE CENTRAL REGULATION OF FEEDING, NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, PAGE(S) 69-72, (19960104), ISSN 0028-0836, XP002058608 [X] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/379069a0
 [PX]  - NAVARRO M ET AL, "COLOCALIZATION OF GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-1 (GLP-1) RECEPTORS, GLUCOSE TRANSPORTER GLUT-2, AND GLUCOKINASE MRNAS IN RAT HYPOTHALAMIC CELLS: EVIDENCE FOR A ROLE OF GLP-1 RECEPTOR AGONISTS AS AN INHIBITORY SIGNAL FOR FOOD AND WATER INTAKE", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1996), vol. 67, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 1982 - 1991, XP002918977 [PX] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - GUTNIZK M K ET AL, POTENTIAL THERAPEUTIC LEVELS OF GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE I ACHIEVED INHUMANS BY A BUCCAL TABLET, DIABETES CARE, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, ALEXANDRIA, VA, US, PAGE(S) 843-848, (19960801), ISSN 0149-5992, XP000614162 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *