Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1688188

EP1688188 - Metal plate coated with polyester resin, and can using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
2-12, Yonbancho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-8447 / JP
[2006/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Hu, Lianchun@c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory
1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
02 / Maida, Narimasa@c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory
1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
03 / Takahashi, Satoshi@c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory
1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
04 / Kurisu, Hiroshi@c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory
1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
 [2012/15]
Former [2006/32]01 / Hu, Lianchun c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory 1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
02 / Maida, Narimasa c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory 1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
03 / Takahashi, Satoshi c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory 1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
04 / Kurisu, Hiroshi c/o Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd.
Technical Research Laboratory 1296-1, Higashitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 744-8611 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/15]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/32]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date05002160.902.02.2005
[2006/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1688188
Date:09.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1688188
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:B05D7/14
[2006/32]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2007/16]
Former [2006/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mit Polyester beschichtetes Metallblech sowie daraus geformte Metalldosen[2006/32]
English:Metal plate coated with polyester resin, and can using the same[2006/32]
French:Tôle de métal revêtue de résine polyester, et boîte de conserve utilisant cette tôle[2006/32]
Examination procedure14.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/39]
04.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2012Fee for grant paid
07.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.04.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2013  30.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Tata Steel IJmuiden B.V.
P.O. Box 10000
1970 CA IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Group Intellectual Property Services
c/o Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V.
P.O. Box 10000 - 3G.37
1970 CA IJmuiden / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2019/32]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2013  30.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Tata Steel IJmuiden BV
P.O. Box 10000
1970 CA IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Group Intellectual Property Services
C/o Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V.
P.O. Box 10000 - 3G.37
NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL
Former [2013/08]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2013   
Tata Steel IJmuiden BV
P.O. Box 10000
1970 CA IJmuiden / NL
Opponent's representative
Bodin, Andre
Tata Steel Nederland Technology BV
Group Intellectual Property Services
PO Box 10000-3G.37
1970 CA IJmuiden / NL
25.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1657/15
16.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE11.04.2012
IT11.04.2012
[2015/21]
Former [2013/04]BE11.04.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0058087  (TOYO KOHAN CO., LTD; HU, LIANCHUN; MAITA, TOMOMASA; TAKAHASHI, SATOSHI) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7,8;
 [Y]JPH11348218  ;
 [E]WO2005053947  (JFE STEEL CORPORATION; SUZUKI, TAKESHI; KUBO, HIROSHI; IWASA, HIROKI) [E] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5407702  (SMITH ET AL) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11348218 A 19991221 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD) [Y] 4,5,7,8 * abstract *