Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1566290

EP1566290 - Method for tensioning and centering of spoked wheels and a machine to carry out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Golz, Günter
Stukendamm 25
33449 Langenberg / DE
[2005/34]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/34]
Representative(s)REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1
37073 Göttingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]Rehberg Hüppe + Partner
Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62
37073 Göttingen / DE
Application number, filing date05003146.715.02.2005
[2005/34]
Priority number, dateDE2004100803019.02.2004         Original published format: DE102004008030
[2005/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1566290
Date:24.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1566290
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B60B31/02
[2005/34]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/43]
Former [2005/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Spannen und Zentrieren von eingespeichten Rädern sowie Maschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens[2005/34]
English:Method for tensioning and centering of spoked wheels and a machine to carry out the method[2005/34]
French:Procédé pour serrer et centrer des roues à rayons et une machine pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé[2005/34]
Examination procedure19.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
24.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200804   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2008
28.02.200905   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2759530  (HERR RICHARD F) [X] 1-6,8,10 * figures 3-5,7; claim 1 * * column 2, line 11 - line 23 * * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 38 * * column 6, line 22 - line 29 * * column 9, line 75 - column 10, line 11 *;
 [X]DE2003524  (JAPAN BICYCLE PROMOTION INST) [X] 1-6,10 * figures 1-6; claim 1 * * BNS Seite 3, 3. Absatz; BNS Seite 5, 1. Absatz; BNS Seite 6, Zeilen 13-28; BNS Seite 7, 1. Absatz; BNS Seite 14, Mitte 2. Absatz; BNS Seite 15, 2. Absatz bis Seite 17, 1. Absatz. *;
 [A]DE19739336  (GOLZ GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figures 1,4; claims 1-3 *