Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1566526

EP1566526 - Coolant pump for motor vehicle, with adjustable drive [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/34]Adjustable drive for motor vehicule
[2012/30]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/13]
Former [2005/34]For all designated states
Behr GmbH & Co. KG
Mauserstrasse 3
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Baumgartner, Roland
Wilhelm-Lächle-Strasse 6
71691 Freiberg / DE
02 / Maus, Ralf
Carl-Peters-Strasse 17
70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
03 / Schultheiss, Gerold
Etivalstrasse 10
75173 Pforzheim / DE
 [2012/33]
Former [2005/34]01 / Baumgartner, Roland
Wilhelm-Lächle-Strasse 6
71691 Freiberg / DE
02 / Maus, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing.
Carl-Peters-Strasse 17
70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE
03 / Schultheiss, Gerold, Dipl.-Ing.
Etivalstrasse 10
75173 Pforzheim / DE
Representative(s)Grauel, Andreas , et al
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Wartbergstrasse 14
70191 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/21]Grauel, Andreas , et al
Grauel IP
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Presselstrasse 10
70191 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date05003510.418.02.2005
[2005/34]
Priority number, dateDE2004100907323.02.2004         Original published format: DE102004009073
[2005/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1566526
Date:24.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1566526
Date:18.01.2006
[2006/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1566526
Date:02.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:F01P5/12, F16D35/02
[2005/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/34]
TitleGerman:Kühlmittelpumpe für ein Kraftfahrzeug, mit regelbarem Antrieb[2012/30]
English:Coolant pump for motor vehicle, with adjustable drive[2012/30]
French:Pompe de refroidissement pour véhicule à moteur, avec dispositif d'entraînement réglable[2012/30]
Former [2005/34]Regelbarer Antrieb für ein Kraftfahrzeug
Former [2005/34]Adjustable drive for motor vehicule
Former [2005/34]Dispositif d'entraînement réglable pour véhicule à moteur
Examination procedure18.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
25.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.06.2012
18.06.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
19.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2012Fee for grant paid
19.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.09.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.09.2013  18.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2013  18.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Soeltlstraße 2a
81545 München / DE
Former [2015/27]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2013  18.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Opponent's representative
Peterreins, Frank, et al
Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Söltlstraße 2a
81545 München / DE
Former [2013/43]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2013  18.09.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Opponent's representative
Peterreins, Frank, et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
HighLight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2013/42]
Opponent(s)01  10.09.2013   
BorgWarner, Inc.
3850 Hamlin Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoefer & Partner, et al
Pilgersheimer Straße 20
81543 München / DE
11.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2016Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.10.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition18.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2500/16
08.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.02.2005
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
AT18.02.2013
IE18.02.2013
LU18.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GB02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
AT18.02.2013
IE18.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GB02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/24]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
AT18.02.2013
IE18.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GB02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/09]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
IE18.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GB02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/07]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
IE18.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/06]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/03]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/49]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/48]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/42]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/40]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/37]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/36]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
ES13.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/35]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
Former [2013/26]SI02.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0114759  (MARTIN HANS [DE]) [X] 1-11,17,18 * page 18, paragraph 12 - page 20, paragraph 17; figures 1,4 *;
 [X]EP0562226  (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,11,13,18 * column 4, paragraphs 11-50; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]JPH04258530  ;
 [X]DE19810296  (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,18 * column 7, paragraphs 41-56 * * column 9, paragraphs 19-30 * * figure - *;
 [X]EP0293102  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,14,18 * column 9, paragraphs 10-37 - column 10, paragraphs 9-19; figure - *;
 [PX]EP1391624  (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1-4,6-10,13,18 * column 7, paragraph 45 - column 8, paragraph 14 * * column 9, paragraphs 1-13 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US2002012593  (OKUDA KAZUMA [JP]) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028]; figures 2,5 *;
 [A]DE4037265  (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 15 * column 8, lines 29-49; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP1353051  (BARUFFALDI SPA [IT]) [A] 15 * figure 1; claims 2,3 *;
 [X]US4320723  (WENDLING VINCENT F, et al) [X] 1,2,16 * column A; figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0232995  (EATON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,16 * column 7, lines 43-61; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]DE9103493U  (BEHR GMBH & CO, 7000 STUTTGART, DE) [A] 16 * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 038, Database accession no. (M - 1358), & JP04258530 A 19920914 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [X] 1,3-9 * abstract *
ExaminationEP1120578