Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1580435

EP1580435 - Turbomolecular pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.07.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH
Berlinerstrasse 43
35614 Asslar / DE
[2005/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Conrad, Armin
Zum Roten Stein 10
35745 Herborn / DE
02 / Fahrenbach, Peter
Emanuelenweg 13
35619 Braunfels / DE
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Knefel, Cordula
Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel
Postfach 19 24
35529 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/35]Knefel, Cordula
Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24
35529 Wetzlar / DE
Former [2011/35](deleted)
...
Application number, filing date05003720.922.02.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateDE2004101271316.03.2004         Original published format: DE102004012713
[2005/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1580435
Date:28.09.2005
Language:DE
[2005/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1580435
Date:30.12.2009
[2009/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1580435
Date:31.08.2011
Language:DE
[2011/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:F04D29/32, F04D19/04, F04D29/54
[2016/49]
Former International [2005/39]F04D19/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
TitleGerman:Turbomolekularpumpe[2005/39]
English:Turbomolecular pump[2005/39]
French:Pompe turbomoléculaire[2005/39]
Examination procedure11.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/32]
19.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2011Fee for grant paid
04.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  15.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Leybold GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  31.05.2012  15.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Limited
Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Opponent's representative
Norton, Ian Andrew, et al
Edwards Limited
Innovation Drive
Burgess Hill
West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB
 [2017/08]
Former [2016/47]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  15.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Leybold GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  31.05.2012  15.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Limited
Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Opponent's representative
Clark, Charles Robert, et al
Edwards Limited Intellectual Property Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Former [2012/31]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012  15.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  31.05.2012  15.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Limited
Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Opponent's representative
Clark, Charles Robert
Edwards Limited Intellectual Property Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Former [2012/28]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012   
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kirschbaum, Alexander
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 02  31.05.2012   
Edwards Limited
Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Opponent's representative
Clark, Charles Robert
Edwards Limited Intellectual Property Manor Royal Crawley
West Sussex RH10 9LW / GB
Former [2012/27]
Opponent(s)01  30.05.2012   
Oerlikon Leybold Vacuum GmbH
Bonner Strasse 498
50968 Köln / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kirschbaum, Alexander
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
27.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.11.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition27.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0530/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
04.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.02.2005
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
AT22.02.2012
LU22.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
AT22.02.2012
LU22.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/21]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
AT22.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/31]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
AT22.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
BE28.02.2012
CH29.02.2012
LI29.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2012/26]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
Former [2012/23]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
Former [2012/21]CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
Former [2012/20]CY31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
IE31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
Former [2012/12]CY31.08.2011
FI31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
Former [2012/11]FI31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
Former [2012/10]FI31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
IS31.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI31.08.2011
LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
IS31.12.2011
Former [2012/08]LT31.08.2011
NL31.08.2011
IS31.12.2011
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE7237362U  (LEYBOLD-HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [AD] 1,9 * page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3402549  (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4,9 * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 6 * * page 8, line 17 - line 21; figure 3 *;
 [A]DE4206972  (JAPAN ATOMIC ENERGY RES INST [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 1, line 45 - line 60; figures 6-8 *;
 [A]WO0225116  (LEYBOLD VAKUUM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 3, paragraph l * * page 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS6125993  (ULVAC CORP) [A] 1,9 * page 629, paragraph oben rechts - paragraph unten links; figure 4 *