Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1616654

EP1616654 - Power source for electric arc welding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lincoln Global, Inc.
9160 Norwalk Boulevard
Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 / US
[2017/29]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Lincoln Global, Inc.
17721 Railroad Street
City of Industry CA 91748 / US
Former [2006/08]For all designated states
LINCOLN GLOBAL, INC.
14824 Marquardt Avenue
Santa Fe Springs CA 90670 / US
Former [2006/03]For all designated states
LINCOLN GLOBAL, INC.
1200 Monterey Pass Road Monterey Park
California 91754 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Daniel, Joseph A.
7946 N. Gannett Rd.
Sagamore Hills, OH 44067 / US
02 / Kooken, Todd E.
3842 Grenville Rd.
University Hts., OH 44118 / US
03 / Luo, Lifeng
6957 Longview Dr.
Solon, Ohio 44139 / US
 [2006/03]
Representative(s)Knauer, Joachim , et al
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43 A
45133 Essen / DE
[2009/41]
Former [2006/03]Hennicke, Ernst Rüdiger , et al
Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Postfach 19 04 08
50501 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date05005216.610.03.2005
[2006/03]
Priority number, dateUS2004088986613.07.2004         Original published format: US 889866
[2006/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1616654
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1616654
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/10
[2006/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/19]
Former [2006/03]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stromquelle für das Lichtbogenschweissen[2006/03]
English:Power source for electric arc welding[2006/03]
French:alimentation de soudage à l'arc.[2006/03]
Examination procedure29.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/04]
13.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2018Fee for grant paid
15.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2007
Opposition(s)12.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.10.2014Request for further processing filed
17.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.10.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
SI09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/10]CZ09.05.2018
DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
RO09.05.2018
SK09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK09.05.2018
EE09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK09.05.2018
ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
NL09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
GR10.08.2018
Former [2018/50]ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
BG09.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES09.05.2018
LT09.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XDY]US6177645  (CHURCH LARRY L [US], et al) [XD] 1,4,14,26,28,40,41,44,54,56 * column 6, paragraph L - column 8, paragraph 1; figure 2 * [Y] 17,24,25,58,59,63;
 [YD]US6504132  (CHURCH LARRY L [US]) [YD] 24,25,59,63 * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [YD]US5991169  (KOOKEN TODD ERIC [US]) [YD] 17,58 * abstract;; figure 2 *;
 [AD]US6278080  (MORIGUCHI HARUO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-72 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH0241777
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900425), vol. 0142, no. 03, Database accession no. (M - 0966), & JP02041777 A 19900209 (DAIHEN CORP.) [A] 1-72 * column A *
by applicantUS6723597
 US6504132