Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1703689

EP1703689 - A local area network for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2006/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Larisch, Markus
Kerkerfeld 11 a
46514 Schermbeck / DE
02 / Bego-Ghina, Rainer
Präsidentstrasse 53
44791 Bochum / DE
03 / Krause, Harald
Am Rosenberg 20
45525 Hattlingen / DE
 [2006/38]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Former [2008/31]Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Former [2008/28](deleted)
...
Former [2006/38]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date05006013.618.03.2005
[2006/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1703689
Date:20.09.2006
Language:DE
[2006/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1703689
Date:17.09.2008
Language:DE
[2008/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, B60R16/02
[2006/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/38]
TitleGerman:Lokales Netzwerk für Fahrzeuge[2006/38]
English:A local area network for vehicles[2006/38]
French:Réseau local pour véhicules[2006/38]
Examination procedure15.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/38]
18.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2008Fee for grant paid
22.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY17.09.2008
CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
PL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
TR17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
GR18.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
AT18.03.2009
GB18.03.2009
HU18.03.2009
LU18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/32]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
PL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
GR18.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
AT18.03.2009
GB18.03.2009
HU18.03.2009
LU18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2011/21]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
PL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
GR18.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
AT18.03.2009
GB18.03.2009
LU18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/51]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
PL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
GR18.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
AT18.03.2009
GB18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/30]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
PL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
AT18.03.2009
GB18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/23]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
PL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
GB18.03.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/11]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
SE17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
BE31.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/47]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/36]CZ17.09.2008
DK17.09.2008
EE17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
IE17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2009/26]CZ17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
NL17.09.2008
RO17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
PT17.02.2009
Former [2009/24]CZ17.09.2008
FI17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
SK17.09.2008
BG17.12.2008
ES28.12.2008
IS17.01.2009
Former [2009/20]FI17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
ES28.12.2008
Former [2009/15]FI17.09.2008
LT17.09.2008
SI17.09.2008
Former [2009/09]LT17.09.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10254285  (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] *;
 [X]EP1309132  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 24 * * column 6, paragraph 48 - paragraph 50 *;
 [X]US6145082  (GANNON ET AL) [X] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 19 - line 29 *;
 [A]US6314351  (CHUTORASH RICHARD J) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 14 - line 34 *