Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1580586

EP1580586 - Scanning confocal microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.04.2009
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.05.2009  [2009/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
[2008/24]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawano, Yoshihiro
1-16-123, Yotsuya
Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183-0035 / JP
02 / Hirata, Tadashi
15-102, Nishiasakawa-machi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0842 / JP
03 / Nakata, Tatsuo
26-3-205, Manganji 1-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0024 / JP
04 / Tanikawa, Yoshihisa
8-9, Nihonbashiningyouchou 1-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP
 [2008/48]
Former [2008/24]01 / Kawano, Yoshihiro
27-16-102, Minamino 3-chome
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0916 / JP
02 / Hirata, Tadashi
15-102, Nishiasakawa-machi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0842 / JP
03 / Nakata, Tatsuo
26-3-205, Manganji 1-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0024 / JP
04 / Tanikawa, Yoshihisa
8-9, Nihonbashiningyouchou 1-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP
Former [2005/39]01 / Kawano, Yoshihiro
3-27-102, Minamino 3-chome
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0916 / JP
02 / Hirata, Tadashi
15-102, Nishiasakawa-machi
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0842 / JP
03 / Nakata, Tatsuo
26-3-205, Manganji 1-chome
Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0024 / JP
04 / Tanikawa, Yoshihisa
8-9, Nihonbashiningyouchou 1-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP
Representative(s)von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]von Hellfeld, Axel
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date05006144.921.03.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateJP2004009000225.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004090002
JP2004009105026.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004091050
JP2004011932814.04.2004         Original published format: JP 2004119328
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1580586
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1580586
Date:11.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/00, G02B23/26
[2005/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/24]
Former [2005/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Scannendes konfokales Mikroskop[2005/39]
English:Scanning confocal microscope[2005/39]
French:Microscope confocal à balayage[2005/39]
Examination procedure11.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/11]
29.03.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2008Fee for grant paid
25.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.05.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006BG   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006CZ   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006EE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006HU   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006IS   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006LT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006PL   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006RO   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006SI   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006SK   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]IE20000001  (MCCABE EITHNE) [Y] 1-3 * figures 4,5 *;
 [Y]WO0144854  (DIGITAL OPTICAL IMAGING CORPORATION; MACAULAY, CALUM, E; DLUGAN, ANDRE) [Y] 1-4 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO9922262  (MACAULAY, CALUM, E) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2002090628  ;
 [A]  - GMITRO A F ET AL, "CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY THROUGH A FIBER-OPTIC IMAGING BUNDLE", OPTICS LETTERS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (19930415), vol. 18, no. 8, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 565 - 567, XP000364196 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002090628 A 20020327 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - LANE P M; ELLIOTT R P; MACAULAY C E, "Confocal microendoscopy with chromatic sectioning", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 4959, XP002336379 [Y] 1-4 * page 23 - page 26 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.485552