Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1589081

EP1589081 - Pigment-based inks for ink-jet printing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2014No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2014  [2014/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2013/33]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249
Houston TX 77070 / US
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249 Houston
Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Stephen W.
16399 W Bernardo Drive
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
02 / Ma, Zeying
16399 W Bernardo Drive
San Diego, CA 92127 / US
 [2005/43]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann
Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2013/33]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2009/29]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2005/43]Schoppe, Fritz , et al
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date05006298.322.03.2005
[2005/43]
Priority number, dateUS2004082858020.04.2004         Original published format: US 828580
US2005004570427.01.2005         Original published format: US 45704
[2005/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1589081
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1589081
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00
[2005/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2006/27]
Former [2005/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Pigmenthaltige Tinten für den Tintenstrahldruck[2005/43]
English:Pigment-based inks for ink-jet printing[2005/43]
French:Encres à base de pigment pour l'impression par jet d'encre[2005/43]
Examination procedure08.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/14]
02.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2013Fee for grant paid
27.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.07.2008
Opposition(s)15.05.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL14.08.2013
[2014/22]
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2370580  (* ILFORD IMAGING UK LIMITED) [A] 2,3,10,13,21 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 12 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 11 * * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 12 * * page 10, line 23 - page 12, line 2; examples 2,3 *;
 [A]EP1217047  (ILFORD IMAGING UK LIMITED) [A] 2,3,10,13,21 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] - [0014] - [0016] , [0024] , [0041] , [0042] *;
 [A]US2002017219  (YAMAZAKI HIDEO ET AL) [A] 2,3 * paragraphs [0012] - [0020] - [0023] - [0027]; examples 1-4 *;
 [A]US5803958  (KATSEN ET AL) [A] 2 * examples 1,2,6 *
ExaminationUS2003056687
by applicantGB2370580
 US5803958
 US2003056687