EP1579934 - Process for the production of a muffle for investment casing or modell casting and composition of such a muffle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEGO Bremer Goldschlägerei Wilh.-Herbst GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Herbst-Strasse 1 28359 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states BEGO Bremer Goldschlägerei Wilh.-Herbst GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Herbst-Strasse 1 28359 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states BEGO Bremer Goldschlägerei Wilh. Herbst GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Herbst-Strasse 1 28359 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiest, Thomas, Dr. Richard Wagner Ring 11 36088 Hünfeld / DE | 02 /
Dierkes, Stephan, Dr. Ellhornstrasse 11 28195 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Schlüter, Martin, Dr. Drontheimerstrasse 14 28719 Bremen / DE | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05006684.4 | 26.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | DE20041014573 | 25.03.2004 Original published format: DE102004014573 | [2005/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579934 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579934 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/08, B22C1/18 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
B28B7/40 (EP,US);
B22C1/02 (EP,US);
B22C7/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/04 (EP,US);
B28B1/007 (EP,US);
B28B7/346 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/185 (EP,US);
C04B35/62655 (EP,US);
C04B35/6316 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/401 (EP,US);
C04B2235/402 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Muffel für den Fein- oder Modellguss sowie Zusammensetzung zu deren Herstellung | [2005/39] | English: | Process for the production of a muffle for investment casing or modell casting and composition of such a muffle | [2005/39] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un moufle pour le moulage de précision ou le moulage sur modèle ainsi que la composition pour sa fabrication | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | LT | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | AT | 26.03.2009 | GB | 26.03.2009 | LU | 26.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | IS | 03.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
AT | 26.03.2009 | ||
GB | 26.03.2009 | ||
LU | 26.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
AT | 26.03.2009 | ||
GB | 26.03.2009 | ||
LU | 26.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
AT | 26.03.2009 | ||
GB | 26.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
AT | 26.03.2009 | ||
GB | 26.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
GB | 26.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 03.12.2008 | |
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19607380 (KOWALSKI JUERGEN [DE]) [AD] 1-19* the whole document *; | [X]WO9941030 (BUNTROCK IND INC [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 3; example 1; claims 1-9; tables 1,2 * |