Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1580910

EP1580910 - Method for displaying a control panel view useable to monitor and control an audio device in a computing system having a graphical user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/39]Audio-related system node instantiation
[2019/25]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.06.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman International Industries, Inc.
8500 Balboa Boulevard Northridge
CA 91329 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Harman International Industries, Inc.
8500 Balboa Boulevard Northridge
CA 91329 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kreifeldt, Richard Allen
11307 Brown Summit Circle
South Jordan, Utah 84095 / US
02 / Lee, John
3127 South 3380 East
Salt Lake City UT 84109 / US
03 / Plunkett, William A.
52202 Lookout Pointee
Granger IN 46530 / US
04 / Shuttleworth, Timothy J.
5102 Calatrana Drive
Woodland Hills CA 91364 / US
05 / Stevenson, Andrew
6 Morpeth Close Hemel Hempstead
Hertfordshire, HP2 4JD / GB
06 / Werf, Bruce Vander
23879 Banyon Circle
Elkhart IN 46516 / US
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05006735.429.03.2005
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateUS20040557117P26.03.2004         Original published format: US 557117 P
US20050644967P18.01.2005         Original published format: US 644967 P
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1580910
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1580910
Date:13.02.2008
[2008/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04H60/04, H04L29/08, H04R27/00
[2019/25]
Former International [2005/39]H04H7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Anzeigen eines Bedienfeldes, das verwendbar ist zum Überwachen und Kontrollieren eines Audiogerätes in einem Rechnersystem mit einer graphischen Benutzeroberfläche[2019/25]
English:Method for displaying a control panel view useable to monitor and control an audio device in a computing system having a graphical user interface[2019/25]
French:Méthode pour afficher un panneau de commande, qui peut être utilisé pour surveiller et pour le contrôle d'un appareil audio dans un système d'ordinateur comportant une interface utilisateur graphique[2019/25]
Former [2005/39]Knoteninstanzierung für Tonverarbeitungssysteme
Former [2005/39]Audio-related system node instantiation
Former [2005/39]Instantiation de noeud dans un système de traitement de signaux audiophoniques
Examination procedure29.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
25.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2011Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.06.2011
06.06.2011Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
08.10.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Appeal following examination14.12.2015Appeal received No.  T1653/16
18.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
25.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0917046  (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006]; claims 1,7 *