Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1580910 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1580910



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1099
02.09.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.11.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.09.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.09.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
12.09.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
03.06.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.06.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.06.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
03.06.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 120
03.06.2019 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 120
03.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
03.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
03.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.05.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.03.2019 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
14.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
08.11.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
29.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 9
29.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.12.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
29.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Refund of fees Appeal 1
03.11.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 9
27.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 8
27.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.07.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.07.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.06.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 2
18.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
18.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
18.02.2016 Claims Appeal 9
18.02.2016 Claims Appeal 9
18.02.2016 Claims Appeal 9
18.02.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
14.12.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
26.11.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.10.2015 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 11
08.10.2015 Means of redress Search / examination 2
08.10.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
15.06.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.06.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.06.2015 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
01.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
01.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 9
01.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 9
01.06.2015 Claims Search / examination 10
01.06.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 8
08.05.2015 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.05.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.02.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 Annex to a communication Search / examination 16
17.02.2015 Annex to a communication Search / examination 79
17.02.2015 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
17.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 11
17.02.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.02.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
21.06.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.06.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
13.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.06.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.06.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.06.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.06.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.06.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.06.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.05.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.05.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 13
03.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 10
03.05.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 9
17.02.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.02.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
04.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
04.02.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
31.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.08.2010 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.07.2010 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
05.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 9
05.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 8
05.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
25.04.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.04.2008 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.03.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
18.02.2008 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
23.05.2007 General enquiry Search / examination 1
18.08.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.07.2005 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.2005 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.06.2005 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
23.05.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.05.2005 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.05.2005 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.05.2005 Priority document Search / examination 62
03.05.2005 Priority document Search / examination 157
29.03.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.03.2005 Claims Search / examination 9
29.03.2005 Description Search / examination 87
29.03.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2005 Drawings Search / examination 29
29.03.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6