Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1587229

EP1587229 - System for node structure determination in an audio-related system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.03.2011
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED
8500 Balboa Boulevard
Northridge, CA 91329 / US
[2005/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Kreifeldt, Richard Allen
11307 Brown Summit Circle
South Jordan, Utah 84095 / US
02 / Lee, John
3127 South 3380 East
Salt Lake City, UT 84109 / US
03 / Plunkett, William A.
52202 Lookout Pointe
Granger, IN 46530 / US
04 / Shuttleworth, Timothy J.
5102 Calatrana Drive
Woodland Hills, CA 91364 / US
05 / Stevenson, Andrew
6 Morpeth Close
Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire, HP2 4JD / GB
06 / Vander Werf, Bruce
23879 Banyon Circle
Elkhart, IN 46516 / US
 [2005/42]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/42]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05006789.129.03.2005
[2005/42]
Priority number, dateUS20040557117P26.03.2004         Original published format: US 557117 P
US20050644967P18.01.2005         Original published format: US 644967 P
[2005/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1587229
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1587229
Date:02.07.2008
[2008/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04H7/00
[2005/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/42]
TitleGerman:System zur Erfassung der Knotenstruktur in einem System bezüglich der Audioverarbeitung[2008/27]
English:System for node structure determination in an audio-related system[2005/42]
French:Système pour la détermination de la structure de noeud dans un système de traitement de signaux audiophoniques[2005/42]
Former [2005/42]System zur Erfassung der Knotenstruktur in einem Audioverarbeitungssystem
Examination procedure29.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/42]
25.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.09.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination27.11.2015Appeal received No.  T1185/16
28.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002193894  (TERADA KOTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,19,25,30,32 * paragraph [0008]; claim 1 *