Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1557129

EP1557129 - Vascular tissue sealing pressure control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.03.2012
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2012  [2012/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien AG
Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2007/33]
Former [2005/30]For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Bahnhofstrasse 29
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Buysse, Steven Paul
741 Rider Ridge Drive
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
02 / Kennedy, Jenifer S.
5235 Independence Road
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
03 / Lands, Michael J.
176 Cherrywood Lane
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
04 / Loeffler, Donald R.
614 Ridge View Drive
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
05 / Lukianow, S. Wade
27036 Boulder Canyon Dr.
Nederland, CO 80466 / US
06 / Ryan, Thomas P.
729 Parkview Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
 [2006/39]
Former [2005/44]01 / Buysse, Steven Paul
741 Rider Ridge Drive
Boulder, CO 80304 / US
02 / Kennedy, Jenifer S.
5235 Independence Road
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
03 / Lands, Michael J.
176 Cherrywood Lane
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
04 / Loeffler, Donald R.
614 Ridge View Drive
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
05 / Lukianow, S. Wade
27036 Boulder Canyon Dr.
Nederland, CO 80466 / US
06 / Ryan, Thomas P.
729 Parkview Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
Former [2005/30]01 / Buysse, Steven Paul
741 Rider Ridge Drive
Boulder, CO 80304 / US
02 / Kennedy, Jenifer S.
5235 Independence Road
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
03 / Lands, Michael J.
361 South Meeker Court
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
04 / Loeffler, Donald R.
614 Ridge View Drive
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
05 / Lukianow, S. Wade
7339 Buckingham Road
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
06 / Ryan, Thomas P.
729 Parkview Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/30]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date05006999.612.08.1996
[2005/30]
Priority number, dateUS1995053045019.09.1995         Original published format: US 530450
[2005/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1557129
Date:27.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1557129
Date:27.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/28, A61B18/14
[2005/30]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2005/30]
TitleGerman:Steuerung des auf das Gefässgewebe ausgeübten Schliessdruckes[2005/30]
English:Vascular tissue sealing pressure control[2005/30]
French:Commande de pression pour la fermeture des tissus vasculaires[2005/30]
Examination procedure31.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/30]
08.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2011Fee for grant paid
11.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96925051.3  / EP0862387
Opposition(s)30.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 14
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5190541  (ABELE ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 17 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 2 * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 42; figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 3-6,11;
 [Y]US4671274  (SOROCHENKO ET AL) [Y] 3 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4416276  (NEWTON ET AL) [Y] 4,5 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 65; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5342357  (NARDELLA ET AL) [Y] 6 * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 4 *;
 [Y]WO9507662  (MICROSURGE, INC) [Y] 11 * figure 7 *