Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1589416

EP1589416 - Method and system for generating a source code for a computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.08.2008
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allgeier IT Solutions GmbH
Hans-Bredow-Strasse 60
28307 Bremen / DE
[2017/27]
Former [2011/03]For all designated states
Metasonic AG
Münchner Strasse 29 Hettenshausen
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
jCOM1 AG
Lilienthalstrasse 17
85296 Rohrbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fleischmann, Albert, Dr.
Burgfiedenstrasse 16
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
02 / Meyer, Nils
Fuchsberg 16
85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE
 [2005/43]
Representative(s)HGF Europe LLP
Neumarkter Str. 18
81673 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/44](deleted)
...
Former [2013/11]Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
PATRONUS IP
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Truderinger Straße 246
81825 München / DE
Former [2005/43]Ganahl, Bernhard , et al
Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Application number, filing date05008903.622.04.2005
[2005/43]
Priority number, dateDE2004101995823.04.2004         Original published format: DE102004019958
[2005/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1589416
Date:26.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1589416
Date:31.10.2007
[2007/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F11/36
[2007/35]
Former International [2005/43]G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Erzeugen eines Quellcodes für ein Computerprogramm[2005/43]
English:Method and system for generating a source code for a computer program[2005/43]
French:Méthode et système pour générer un code source pour un programme d'ordinateur[2005/43]
Examination procedure23.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/01]
01.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.10.2014
14.10.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination30.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0517/16
17.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
29.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
24.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
20.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
26.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
12.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Stay/Interruption01.08.2014Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2014/42]
01.04.2015Resumption of proceedings[2014/42]
Documents cited:Search[A]US6212672  (KELLER STEVEN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10,13-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 4 *;
 [X]US5610828  (KODOSKY JEFFREY L [US] ET AL) [X] 11,12 * abstract * * column 35, lines 14-33 *
 [X]  - HARRISON W ET AL, "SUBJECT-ORIENTED PROGRAMMING (A CRITIQUE OF PURE OBJECTS)", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES, ACM, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19931001), vol. 28, no. 10, ISSN 0362-1340, pages 411 - 428, XP000411740 [X] 1-10,13-15 * page 413, column R, line 10 - page 414, column L, line 32 * * page 415, column L, line 40 - column R, line 24 * * page 420, column R, line 20 - page 421, column L, line 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/167962.165932
 [X]  - OSSHER H ET AL, "Subject-Oriented Programming: Supporting Decentralized Development of Objects", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH IBM CONFERENCE ON OBJECT-ORIENTED TECHNOLOGY, (199407), pages 1 - 13, URL: http://www.research.ibm.com/sop/papers/decentralized.ps, (20070717), XP002442912 [X] 1-10,13-15 * page 1, lines 16-23 * * page 5, line 6 - page 7, line 8 *
 [PX]  - SOBOCZENSKI F, "Anwenderhandbuch jPass!", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20050303), pages 1 - 38, URL: http://www.bw.fh-deggendorf.de/kurse/swt_neu/Toollabor/Anwenderhandbuch_jPass.pdf, (20070705), XP002442913 [PX] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ANONYMOUS, "CSC444F Software Engineering I - Tutorial Assignment 2", INTERNET ARTICLE, (200109), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20031203194734/http://www.cs.toronto.edu/~sme/CSC444F/assignments/A2-design-and-test-documentation.pdf, (20070921), XP002452057 [X] 11,12 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 8 *