EP1591548 - Method for producing of a low thermal expansion Ni-base superalloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daido Steel Co., Ltd. 1-10, Higashisakura 1-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Daido Steel Co., Ltd. 1-10, Higashisakura 1-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Daido Steel Co., Ltd. 11-18, Nishiki 1-chome, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueta, Shigeki c/o Daido Steel Co., Ltd. Research & Development Lab. 30, Daidocho 2-chome Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Noda, Toshiharu c/o Daido Steel Co., Ltd. Research & Development Lab. 30, Daidocho 2-chome Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Ryuichi c/o Takasago R & D Center Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Kadoya, Yoshikuni c/o Takasago R & D Center Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Magoshi, Ryotaro c/o Takasago Machinery Works Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Arai-cho Shinhama 2-chome Takasago Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Nishimoto, Shin c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl & Partner GbR Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Schorr, Frank Jürgen, et al Diehl Glaeser Hiltl & Partner, Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05009211.3 | 27.04.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | JP20040132135 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004132135 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591548 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591548 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/10, C22C19/05 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22C19/03 (EP,US);
C22C19/057 (EP,US);
C22C19/058 (EP,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer wärmedehnungsarmen Superlegierung auf Ni-basis | [2005/44] | English: | Method for producing of a low thermal expansion Ni-base superalloy | [2005/44] | French: | Procédé de production d'un superalliage à base de Ni à faible dilatation thermique | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 25.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.10.2007 | CY | 17.10.2007 | CZ | 17.10.2007 | DK | 17.10.2007 | EE | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | LT | 17.10.2007 | NL | 17.10.2007 | PL | 17.10.2007 | RO | 17.10.2007 | SI | 17.10.2007 | SK | 17.10.2007 | TR | 17.10.2007 | BG | 17.01.2008 | GR | 18.01.2008 | ES | 28.01.2008 | IS | 17.02.2008 | PT | 17.03.2008 | HU | 18.04.2008 | LU | 27.04.2008 | IE | 28.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/36] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
HU | 18.04.2008 | ||
LU | 27.04.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
LU | 27.04.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
IE | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 17.10.2007 | |
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LT | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | LT | 17.10.2007 | |
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | LT | 17.10.2007 | |
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
PL | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
IS | 17.02.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2003013161 ; | [A]US3898109 (SHAW STUART WALTER KER) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 61 * * claims 1-4; tables I,II *; | [DA]EP1035225 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * whole document *; | [A]EP1096033 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0015] , [0021] , [0026] * * page 5; table 1 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP1191118 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0026] - [0036]; examples A,B; table 1 ** claims 1-9; table 2 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003013161 A 20030115 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD; DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [DA] 1 * abstract * * examples 1-21; tables 1-4 * |