Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1564950 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1564950



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 674
12.10.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.10.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
01.10.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.09.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
16.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
16.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.07.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
16.07.2015 Claims Appeal 2
16.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.07.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.03.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
26.03.2015 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 29
23.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.09.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
10.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.04.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 20
10.04.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 5
10.04.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 16
03.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.04.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.01.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
10.12.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
16.11.2012 Claims Appeal 2
16.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
18.09.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.09.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.08.2012 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
18.07.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.07.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
18.07.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
18.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.07.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.06.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
07.06.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.06.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.06.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
03.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
03.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.05.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
13.02.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.01.2012 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
13.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
25.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
25.05.2010 Description Search / examination 72
25.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.05.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.03.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.03.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.11.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
17.11.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2009 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 General enquiry Search / examination 1
11.05.2009 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.04.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.02.2007 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.01.2006 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.08.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.07.2005 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
06.07.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.06.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.06.2005 European search report Search / examination 3
17.06.2005 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
03.06.2005 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
20.05.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.05.2005 Claims Search / examination 3
20.05.2005 Description Search / examination 72
20.05.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.2005 Drawings Search / examination 77
20.05.2005 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 12
20.05.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.05.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
14.02.2000 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 45
14.02.2000 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
14.02.2000 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 41
14.01.2000 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 59