Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1619100

EP1619100 - Carriage system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.01.2014
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 11.06.2014  [2014/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601 / JP
[2006/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Nakao, Takashi
19-1-1211, Ishizu Minami-machi
Neyagawa-shi Osaka / JP
02 / Nakamura, Yoichi
2-11, Ichimonbashi 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto / JP
03 / Ishiura, Akihiko
116-27, Furukawa-sho
Hazukashi
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP
 [2013/11]
Former [2006/04]01 / Nakao, Takashi
19-1-1211, Ishizu Minami-machi
Neyagawa-shi Osaka / JP
02 / Nakamura, Yoichi
2-11, Ichimonbashi 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto / JP
03 / Ishiura, Akihiko
116-27, Furukawa-sho Hazukashi Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto / JP
Representative(s)Liedl, Christine , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Maximilianstrasse 4b
82319 Starnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/24]Liedl, Christine , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b
82319 Starnberg / DE
Former [2006/04]Liedl, Christine , et al
c/o Hansmann & Vogeser, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date05011256.424.05.2005
[2006/04]
Priority number, dateJP2004021413222.07.2004         Original published format: JP 2004214132
[2006/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1619100
Date:25.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1619100
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1619100
Date:13.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/11]
Former [2012/10]Type: A3  Search report
No.:EP1619100
Date:
Status:(deleted)
[2012/10]
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B61B13/04, G05D1/02, G01D5/34, G05B11/00
[2011/18]
Former International [2006/04]B61B13/04, G05D1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2012/02]
Former [2006/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System mit Laufkatze[2006/04]
English:Carriage system[2006/04]
French:Système à chariot[2006/04]
Examination procedure01.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/29]
25.10.2012Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2013Fee for grant paid
17.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2012
Opposition(s)16.12.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.03.2013
FR31.05.2013
GB13.06.2013
DE03.12.2013
[2014/24]
Former [2014/21]IT13.03.2013
GB13.06.2013
DE03.12.2013
Former [2014/11]IT13.03.2013
DE03.12.2013
Former [2014/10]DE03.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US5329449  (TANIZAWA HIDEICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,3 * * column 3, line 45 - line 54 * * column 5, line 28 - line 55 * * column 4, line 43 - line 50 *;
 [I]US4862048  (SHIMODAIRA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [I] 1-3 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 1, line 50 - line 53 * * column 2, line 46 - line 66 * * column 4, line 36 - line 42 *;
 [A]US5138560  (LANFER HERMANN [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 62 - line 68 * * column 3, line 53 - column 6, line 27 *;
 [A]US4934279  (AZUKIZAWA TERUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 2 *;
 [A]US4701615  (SCHMITT WALTER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 60; figures 1,2a,2b *;
 [A]US4519140  (SCHMITT WALTER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 34; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4306220  (SCHWEFEL ERNST, et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 5 - line 22 *