Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
30.09.2011 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
28.09.2011 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
28.09.2011 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
31.05.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.05.2011 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
21.06.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
13.04.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.01.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
22.09.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.06.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
01.05.2009 | First examination report | |
25.04.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.02.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
10.02.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.06.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.06.2008 | Publication of search report | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
06.06.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.10.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |
21.10.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] |