blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Owing to technical maintenance work online services of the EPO will be temporarily unavailable on Sunday, 4 September 2016, between at least 05.30 and 09.30 CET. We apologise for any inconvenience.

31.08.2016

More...
blank News flashes

Spain joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

05.09.2016

More...
blank Related links

All documents: EP1568919  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1496
11.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
26.03.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.03.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
19.03.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
18.03.2014 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 22
21.12.2013 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 6
19.12.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
19.12.2013 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2013 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 6
09.12.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
03.12.2013 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 6
03.12.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
01.12.2013 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
19.09.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
13.09.2013 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
13.08.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
10.08.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 12
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 7
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 26
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 12
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 3
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 5
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 49
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 6
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 26
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 35
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 18
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 55
07.08.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure Appeal 18
07.08.2013 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 10
07.08.2013 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 10
07.08.2013 Fax relating to review procedure Appeal 9
07.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
30.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 26
19.04.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 26
19.12.2012 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 19
19.12.2012 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 19
03.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
28.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
14.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2012 Claims Appeal 8
07.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.11.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
06.11.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
06.11.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 33
06.11.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
06.11.2012 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
02.11.2012 Claims Opposition 8
02.11.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.05.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.04.2012 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 8
25.04.2012 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.03.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.04.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
13.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
13.04.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
13.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
29.03.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.03.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
18.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.02.2011 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
15.02.2011 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
15.02.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
15.02.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.02.2011 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 1
10.02.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
10.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
09.02.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.02.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 5
21.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
14.01.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
23.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
16.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 18
16.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 26
16.12.2010 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
16.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
16.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
13.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
13.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
13.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.08.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
31.07.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
29.07.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
27.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
22.07.2010 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
19.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 6
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 6
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
13.07.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
13.07.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 6
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Claims Opposition 5
09.07.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
29.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.03.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.03.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 16
18.03.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.03.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
18.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.04.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
07.04.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Claims Opposition 6
03.04.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
01.12.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.10.2008 General authorisation Opposition 1
25.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
25.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
25.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
25.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
25.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
22.10.2008 General authorisation Opposition 1
22.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
22.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 10
22.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
22.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
22.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
22.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
22.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
22.10.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
03.01.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.12.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 6
07.12.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.12.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
07.09.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
07.09.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.09.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
07.09.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
21.08.2007 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
21.08.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.09.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.07.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.07.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.07.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
02.06.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 8
02.06.2005 Description Search / examination 14
02.06.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Drawings Search / examination 6
02.06.2005 General authorisation Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.06.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 6
25.03.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23