blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1580745

EP1580745 - Copyright protection method, reproduction method, reproduction apparatus, recording method and recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2009  [2009/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kuroda, Kazuo, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, No 2610 Hanazono Works
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Moriyama, Yoshiaki, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, No 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Suzuki, Toshio, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, No 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Yoshida, Kazuyuki, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, No 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/48]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151
80750 München / DE
Former [2005/39]Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Application number, filing date05011938.706.06.2001
[2005/39]
Priority number, dateJP2000016950906.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000169509
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1580745
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
ClassificationIPC:G11B20/00, G11B20/18
[2005/39]
CPC:
G11B20/0092 (EP,KR,US); G11B20/00188 (EP,KR,US); G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00688 (EP,KR,US); G11B20/00884 (EP,US); G11B20/1809 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/39]
TitleGerman:Kopierschutzverfahren, Wiedergabeverfahren und -gerät, Aufzeichnungsverfahren und -gerät[2005/39]
English:Copyright protection method, reproduction method, reproduction apparatus, recording method and recording apparatus[2005/39]
French:Méthode de protection contre la copie, méthode et appareil de reproduction, méthode et appareil d'enregistrement[2005/39]
Examination procedure06.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/32]
25.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/32]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01112932.7  / EP1162618
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.