blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

EP Register outages:
Sun 29th of May 05.30 - 07.30 hrs CET

25.05.2016

More...
blank News flashes

The Netherlands and the Former Yugoslav Republic of Macedonia join the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

10.05.2016

More...
blank Related links

All documents: EP1731214  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 701
26.08.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.08.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
04.08.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
25.02.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.02.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
21.02.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.02.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
17.02.2014 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
17.02.2014 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
14.02.2014 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 2
28.01.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.01.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.01.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
21.01.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.01.2014 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.01.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 3
15.01.2014 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
10.01.2014 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
02.10.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
25.09.2013 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2013 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
12.08.2013 Refund of fees Appeal 1
08.08.2013 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 69
08.08.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.07.2013 Closing of application Appeal 2
26.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.06.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
21.06.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
21.06.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
21.06.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.06.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
08.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
17.10.2012 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
17.10.2012 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
06.09.2012 Claims Appeal 1
06.09.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
06.09.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.09.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
05.09.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 28
05.09.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 7
05.09.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
12.07.2012 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 5
27.06.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 2
22.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
21.02.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.02.2012 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
10.02.2012 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.02.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.06.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 1
24.06.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
28.01.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.12.2009 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
09.12.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2009 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
27.02.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.02.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.02.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
13.02.2009 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 36
13.02.2009 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
13.02.2009 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
13.02.2009 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
13.02.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 36
21.01.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.01.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
06.12.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.12.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
26.11.2008 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
26.11.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
26.11.2008 Means of redress Search / examination 2
26.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
26.11.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Search / examination 16
13.10.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.10.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.10.2008 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
09.10.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.08.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.08.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.08.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
30.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
28.11.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
18.07.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
18.07.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.12.2006 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
15.11.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.09.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.09.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 15
08.09.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
21.11.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.11.2005 European search report Search / examination 2
18.11.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
23.06.2005 Drawings Search / examination 6
23.06.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.06.2005 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
11.06.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
11.06.2005 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 35
10.06.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
10.06.2005 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 35
06.06.2005 Abstract Search / examination 2
06.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 4
06.06.2005 Description Search / examination 23
06.06.2005 Drawings Search / examination 6
06.06.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6