Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1591122 Dossier alert: RSS

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 3721
12.10.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
27.09.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 6
11.09.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
07.09.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.09.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.08.2017 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
30.08.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
28.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
24.08.2017 Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties Appeal 1
24.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
24.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
22.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2017 All other documents for the Appeal procedure not covered by any other Code Search / examination 2
22.08.2017 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Search / examination 83
22.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.08.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
22.08.2017 Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure Search / examination 15
22.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 4
18.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
18.08.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
18.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.08.2017 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
17.08.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
14.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
14.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
14.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
14.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
14.08.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
14.08.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 21
09.08.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
21.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
14.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.06.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.06.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 27
31.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
25.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
25.05.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
18.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.05.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
18.05.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.05.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 6
15.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.05.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
11.05.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
10.05.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.03.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
22.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.03.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 12
01.12.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
23.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
17.11.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
17.11.2016 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
27.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
26.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
26.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
25.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 5
24.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.10.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 255
24.10.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
24.10.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 26
24.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 26
24.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
24.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 39
24.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
24.10.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 8
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 2
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 2
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Claims Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Main request during Opposition procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
24.10.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
24.10.2016 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 47
24.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
24.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 46
24.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
21.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
21.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 4
20.10.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
14.09.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
29.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
24.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
24.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
18.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.07.2016 F3056 Communication: Change of Board due to the technical nature of the appeal Appeal 6
07.07.2016 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
14.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 5
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
08.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
08.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 3
08.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.06.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
08.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
07.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
06.06.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
23.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.05.2016 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 37
23.05.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 25
13.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
13.05.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 35
13.05.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.05.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 51
13.05.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 63
13.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.05.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
13.05.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
12.04.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.04.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 6
07.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
06.04.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 6
05.04.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 6
04.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
04.04.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
31.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
31.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 5
12.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
08.02.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 6
03.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
02.02.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
01.02.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
29.01.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 12
29.01.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 22
29.01.2016 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
29.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
29.01.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
29.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.01.2016 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 20
19.01.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
24.12.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 2
24.12.2015 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 2
24.12.2015 Observations by third parties Opposition 3
24.12.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 18
24.12.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 18
24.12.2015 Patent document filed by a Third party Opposition 18
29.10.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
10.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.09.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
28.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
28.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
27.08.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 58
27.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 9
26.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
26.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
29.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2015 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
02.07.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
02.07.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
02.07.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
29.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
29.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
29.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
29.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 24
23.06.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.06.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
23.06.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
23.06.2015 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
23.06.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.06.2015 Communication concerning signing of documents Opposition 1
01.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.06.2015 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
01.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.06.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
06.03.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.02.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
28.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
23.01.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.01.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.11.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
22.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 12
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 50
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 16
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 39
10.04.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
10.04.2014 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 26
10.04.2014 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
14.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2014 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
04.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.02.2014 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.12.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.12.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.07.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.07.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.06.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 65
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
26.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
26.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 12
26.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
26.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
26.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
26.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
26.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
26.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
26.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
25.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.06.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 22
25.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 43
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 12
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 2
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 65
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 22
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 26
25.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 23
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 22
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
25.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
25.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
20.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
20.06.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
20.06.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
20.06.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
06.06.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.05.2013 Advice of delivery Limitation procedure 2
14.05.2013 Advice of delivery Limitation procedure 1
02.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Limitation procedure 1
02.04.2013 Decision to terminate the limitation procedure (opposition procedure pending) Limitation procedure 1
27.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Limitation procedure 1
22.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 2
20.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Limitation procedure 2
20.03.2013 Amended description with annotations Limitation procedure 1
20.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
20.03.2013 Letter/request relating to the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 1
20.03.2013 Letter/request relating to the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 4
18.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
18.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.03.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
18.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
18.03.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
18.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
18.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
18.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
18.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
18.03.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
28.09.2012 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
30.08.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.08.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.08.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.08.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.08.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
15.08.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.06.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.06.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.06.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
04.06.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.05.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.05.2012 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
23.05.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
15.05.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.05.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
21.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.12.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
16.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
16.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.02.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
09.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
08.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
08.02.2011 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
30.11.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.08.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.08.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.04.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.03.2009 Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.01.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.09.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.09.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.09.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
07.11.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.09.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.09.2005 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.09.2005 European search report Search / examination 5
14.06.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.06.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
14.06.2005 Description Search / examination 20
14.06.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2005 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7
14.01.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.01.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27