Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1616531

EP1616531 - Flexible metal wire stent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.09.2009  [2009/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Centre, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael
Barbados, West Indies / BB
[2006/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Ballou, Kurt
33 Church Ln Apt. 2
Watertown MA 02472 / US
02 / Roberts, George, T.
128 Pollard Road
Mountain Lakes NJ 07046 / US
03 / Dimatteo, Kristian, J.
25 Carleton Road
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
04 / Ravenscroft, Adrian, C.
21 Bishop Road
Rochester, MA 02770-1801 / US
 [2006/06]
Former [2006/03]01 / Ballou, Kurt
33 Church Ln Apt. 2
Watertown MA 02472 / US
02 / Roberts, George, T.
128 Pollard Road
Mountain Lakes NJ 07046 / US
03 / Dimatteo, Kristian, J.
25 Carleton Road
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
04 / Ravenscroft, Adrian, C.
33 Buckingham Road
Milton MA 02186 / US
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/03]Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date05013072.329.09.1998
[2006/03]
Priority number, dateUS1997094216201.10.1997         Original published format: US 942162
[2006/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1616531
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1616531
Date:03.05.2006
[2006/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1616531
Date:26.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2006/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2006/03]
TitleGerman:Flexibler Stent aus Draht[2006/03]
English:Flexible metal wire stent[2006/03]
French:Stent flexible en fil métallique[2006/03]
Examination procedure27.06.2005Examination requested  [2006/03]
07.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2007Fee for grant paid
06.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98948591.7  / EP1018985
Opposition(s)29.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.12.2007
CH26.12.2007
CY26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
[2009/36]
Former [2009/13]AT26.12.2007
CH26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
GR27.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
Former [2008/46]AT26.12.2007
CH26.12.2007
DK26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
Former [2008/42]AT26.12.2007
CH26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
PT26.05.2008
Former [2008/36]AT26.12.2007
CH26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
ES06.04.2008
Former [2008/29]AT26.12.2007
CH26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH26.12.2007
FI26.12.2007
LI26.12.2007
SE26.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4022956  (FREUDENBERG SEBASTIAN DR) [Y] 1,3-10 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 1; figure 3; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9529646  (BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION) [Y] 1,3-8,10 * page 13, paragraph L - page 14, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]US5383928  (SCOTT ET AL) [Y] 1,3-8 * column 5, line 26 - column 10, line 12; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5527354  (FONTAINE ET AL) [Y] 9 * column 3, paragraph L; figure 5 *